Global Patent Index - EP 1009274 A1

EP 1009274 A1 2000-06-21 - SYSTEM FOR ADJUSTING THE BRUSH PRESSURE

Title (en)

SYSTEM FOR ADJUSTING THE BRUSH PRESSURE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINSTELLEN DES BURSTENDRUCKES

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE REGLAGE DE LA PRESSION DES BALAIS

Publication

EP 1009274 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98904303 A

Priority

  • GB 9800490 W
  • GB 9703555 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9836675A1] The invention provides for a brush pressure control system for a cleaning, sweeping or scrubbing machine comprising a machine frame (30) supporting a brush head arrangement (8, 27), an actuator arrangement (1, 10) for raising and lowering the brush head (27) is mounted between the frame (30) and the brush head (27), and resilient means operatively connected to the brush head and arranged to at least partially counterbalance the force exerted on the brush head (27) by the actuator (1, 10) when lowering the brush head (27).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 11/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 11/164 (2006.01); A47L 11/40 (2006.01); E01H 1/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 11/4058 (2013.01); A47L 11/164 (2013.01); E01H 1/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9836675A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9836675 A1 19980827; AT 247416 T 20030915; AU 6224598 A 19980909; AU 737103 B2 20010809; CN 1248153 A 20000322; DE 69817371 D1 20030925; DE 69817371 T2 20040609; DK 1009274 T3 20031215; EP 1009274 A1 20000621; EP 1009274 B1 20030820; ES 2209111 T3 20040616; GB 9703555 D0 19970409; JP 2001511688 A 20010814; NO 993907 A 19991014; NO 993907 D0 19990813

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160217

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150831

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NOVAGRAAF SWITZERLAND SA;CHEMIN DE L'ECHO 3;1213 ONEX (CH)

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090218

2010-07-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BRISCOE, WILLIAM ANTHONY

- Free text: BRISCOE, WILLIAM ANTHONY#WADES HOUSE#BARTON STACEY WINCHESTER, HAMPSHIRE SO21 3RJ (GB) -TRANSFER TO- BRISCOE, WILLIAM ANTHONY#WADES HOUSE#BARTON STACEY WINCHESTER, HAMPSHIRE SO21 3RJ (GB)

2010-04-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090218

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080217

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2009-01-30 [PGRI CH] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Effective date: 20081128

2008-12-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: LE BREVET A ETE REACTIVE SELON LA DEMANDE DE POURSUITE DE LA PROCEDURE DU 28.11.2008.

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-11-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080217

2008-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070830

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070219

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070821

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070815

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BRISCOE WILLIAM ANTHONY

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-11-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2007-10-15 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2007-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070831

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-10 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060410

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-28 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-28 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-06-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2209111 T3

2004-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WILLIAM BLANC & CIE CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDUSTRI

2004-02-27 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: LE BREVET A ETE REACTIVE SELON LA DEMANDE DE POURSUITE DE LA PROCEDURE DU 21.01.2004.

2004-01-20 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040120

2003-12-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-11-20 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031120

2003-11-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031120

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69817371 P 20030925

2003-09-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-08-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-08-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030820

2003-08-20 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030820

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010927

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990819

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE