Global Patent Index - EP 1009288 A1

EP 1009288 A1 2000-06-21 - APPARATUS FOR MAKING A FUSED LOOP OF FILAMENTOUS MATERIAL

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR MAKING A FUSED LOOP OF FILAMENTOUS MATERIAL

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES VERSCHWEISSTEN RINGES AUS FASERMATERIAL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'ELABORATION D'UNE BOUCLE REUNIE PAR FUSION DE MATERIAU FILAMENTEUX

Publication

EP 1009288 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98942274 A

Priority

  • US 9817770 W
  • US 91929797 A
  • US 11839598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9909891A1] This invention is a fused loop (10) of an elongated material such as a surgical suture, and apparatus for making the loop. Portions of one or more segments (12) to be joined together are fused in a welding process to form a welded joint (14). The shear area of the fused portion (20) of the joint (14) determines the strength of the joint (14), and is thus preferably relatively large. Various configurations for the welding apparatus facilitate the creation of relatively large fused portions (20) of the joint (14) by maximizing contact between at least one of the welding members of the apparatus, and at least one of the segments (12) to be joined.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/04 (2006.01); A61B 17/06 (2006.01); A61L 17/00 (2006.01); A61B 17/00 (2006.01); A61B 17/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 65/08 (2013.01); A61B 17/0487 (2013.01); A61B 17/06166 (2013.01); A61L 17/00 (2013.01); B29C 66/5261 (2013.01); B29C 66/69 (2013.01); B29C 66/80 (2013.01); B29C 66/81422 (2013.01); B29C 66/81423 (2013.01); B29C 66/81433 (2013.01); B29C 66/8322 (2013.01); A61B 17/320068 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00526 (2013.01); A61B 2017/0454 (2013.01); A61B 2017/0619 (2013.01); B29C 66/71 (2013.01); B29C 66/73921 (2013.01); B29C 66/81463 (2013.01); B29K 2023/12 (2013.01); B29K 2067/043 (2013.01); B29K 2077/00 (2013.01); B29K 2101/12 (2013.01); B29L 2031/709 (2013.01); B29L 2031/7096 (2013.01); B29L 2031/7102 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B29C 66/81463 + B29C 65/00
  2. B29C 66/71 + B29K 2077/00
  3. B29C 66/71 + B29K 2067/043
  4. B29C 66/71 + B29K 2067/00
  5. B29C 66/71 + B29K 2023/12

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9909891 A1 19990304; AU 737903 B2 20010906; AU 9036798 A 19990316; CA 2302356 A1 19990304; CA 2302356 C 20070424; EP 1009288 A1 20000621; EP 1009288 A4 20090826; EP 1009288 B1 20150708; JP 2001513388 A 20010904; JP 4425459 B2 20100303; US 2002116027 A1 20020822; US 2005165448 A1 20050728; US 2005216058 A1 20050929; US 6286746 B1 20010911; US 6358271 B1 20020319; US 7090111 B2 20060815; US 8197508 B2 20120612

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160817

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150827

2016-06-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20160411

2016-06-01 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-04-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150708

2016-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150708

2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-04-11 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69843415

2016-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150708

2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150708

2016-02-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151109

2016-02-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150708

2016-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150708

2016-01-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151009

2015-12-16 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20150708

2015-11-15 [REG AT MK05] REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT

- Document: AT 734746 T

- Effective date: 20150708

2015-08-20 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 69843415

2015-08-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2015-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2015-07-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 734746 T

- Effective date: 20150715

2015-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2015-07-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2015-04-08 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150311

2010-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100416

2009-08-26 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090728

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000328

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE