Global Patent Index - EP 1009345 A1

EP 1009345 A1 2000-06-21 - SKIN AGING AND WOUND TREATMENT USING CELL MIGRATION AGENTS

Title (en)

SKIN AGING AND WOUND TREATMENT USING CELL MIGRATION AGENTS

Title (de)

BEHANDLUNG VON HAUTALTERUNG UND HAUTWUNDEN MITTELS ZELLMIGRATIONSWIRKSTOFFEN

Title (fr)

TRAITEMENT DU VIEILLISSEMENT ET DES LESIONS DE LA PEAU A L'AIDE D'AGENTS DE MIGRATION CELLULAIRE

Publication

EP 1009345 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98934222 A

Priority

  • US 9813675 W
  • US 88477997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9900079A1] A cell migration agent promotes the healing of wounds by promoting movement of fibroblast cells away from the periphery of the wound. The agents can include Indole-3-Acetic acid and its derivatives such as Indole-3-Acetyl-L-Phenylalanine. Significant increases in the migration of fibroblast cells were observed at five days after treatment initiation. When administered in a dosage of between 0.1 and 250 ppm, these compounds appear to have the ability to move healthy human fibroblast cells into areas void of cells more rapidly than if the agent were not present. This results in the plumping of the skin or healing of wounds. The compounds can be delivered by topical or internal methods of application.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/49 (2006.01); A61K 31/404 (2006.01); A61K 31/405 (2006.01); A61L 15/42 (2006.01); A61L 27/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/02 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); A61Q 19/00 (2006.01); A61Q 19/08 (2006.01); C07D 209/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/492 (2013.01); A61K 31/404 (2013.01); A61K 31/405 (2013.01); A61Q 19/00 (2013.01); A61Q 19/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH FR LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9900079 A1 19990107; AU 8379798 A 19990119; EP 1009345 A1 20000621; EP 1009345 A4 20020313; JP 2002504933 A 20020212

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-12-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NATERRA INTERNATIONAL, INC.

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-03-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020125

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): CH FR LI

2002-03-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61F 13/00 A, 7A 61K 31/405 B, 7A 61K 31/40 B, 7A 61K 7/48 B

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SONG, JIN

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOCH, JOHN

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SQUIER, MARILYN

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000125

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH FR LI