Global Patent Index - EP 1009353 A1

EP 1009353 A1 2000-06-21 - PHYSIOTHERAPEUTIC DEVICE FOR TREATING THE SKIN BY SUCTION UNDER VACUUM AND ULTRASOUND

Title (en)

PHYSIOTHERAPEUTIC DEVICE FOR TREATING THE SKIN BY SUCTION UNDER VACUUM AND ULTRASOUND

Title (de)

PHYSIOTHERAPEUTISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER HAUT MITTELS SAUGEN DURCH UNTERDRUCK UND ULTRASCHALL

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PHYSIOTHERAPEUTIQUE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA PEAU PAR ASPIRATION SOUS VIDE ET ULTRASON

Publication

EP 1009353 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98942777 A

Priority

  • FR 9801844 W
  • FR 9710622 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2767476A1] Combines the use of ultrasound and vacuum to dilate the epidermal, dermal and hypo-dermal skin layers of skin part being treated. The device (1) is designed to treat the whole skin thickness and includes unit (10) for producing ultrasound, a cup unit (1) for causing a vacuum depression which is used to dilate the layers of a skin part (P) to be treated. The above units are arranged so that during operation, the part (P) of the skin is submitted to several cycles each having a vacuum and ultrasound phase. The vacuum and ultrasound phase are partially superposed during each cycle. The ultrasound unit (10) is an ultrasonic head fed from an ultrasonic generator (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61H 9/00; A61H 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61H 9/00 (2006.01); A61H 23/02 (2006.01); A61B 17/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61H 9/005 (2013.01); A61H 23/0245 (2013.01); A61B 2017/308 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9909928A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2767476 A1 19990226; FR 2767476 B1 19991015; CA 2294822 A1 19990304; EP 1009353 A1 20000621; WO 9909928 A1 19990304

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030717

2004-08-25 [32PN] PUBLIC NOTIFICATION UNDER RULE 80 EPC

- Free text: CONSTATATION DE LA PERTE D'UN DROIT (R. 69 (1) CBE) DATEE DU 09.09.2003 ERMEDICA, 58, RUE POTTIER, 78150 LE CHESNAY, FRANCE

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030306

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991216

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE