Global patent index - EP 1009374 A2

EP 1009374 A2 2000-06-21 - Use of di-n-octylcarbonate and di-2-ethylhexylcarbonate to increase the UV-absorption of octyl methoxycinnamate

Title (en)

Use of di-n-octylcarbonate and di-2-ethylhexylcarbonate to increase the UV-absorption of octyl methoxycinnamate

Title (de)

Verwendung von Di-n-Octylcarbonat und Di-2-ethylhexylcarbonat zur Verstärkung der UV-Absorption von Octylmethoxycinnamat

Title (fr)

Utilisation du di-n-octylcarbonate et du di-2-ethylhexylcarbonate pour augmenter l'absorption UV de l'octyl methoxycinnamate

Publication

EP 1009374 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98946389 A

Priority

  • DE 19737737 A
  • EP 9805293 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19737737A1] The invention relates to the use of dialkyl carbonates as solvent or dispersing agent in UV filters. The carbonic acid esters display non only excellent dissolving or dispersing properties, but also a high spreading capacity, and they enhance UV absorption in a synergistic way.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/27 (2006.01); A61K 8/29 (2006.01); A61K 8/31 (2006.01); A61K 8/33 (2006.01); A61K 8/34 (2006.01); A61K 8/35 (2006.01); A61K 8/37 (2006.01); A61K 8/39 (2006.01); A61K 8/41 (2006.01); A61K 8/46 (2006.01); A61K 8/49 (2006.01); A61K 8/60 (2006.01); A61K 8/66 (2006.01); A61K 8/86 (2006.01); A61K 8/89 (2006.01); A61K 8/891 (2006.01); A61K 8/92 (2006.01); A61K 8/97 (2006.01); A61Q 17/04 (2006.01); C08L 83/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/342 (2013.01); A61K 8/27 (2013.01); A61K 8/29 (2013.01); A61K 8/35 (2013.01); A61K 8/37 (2013.01); A61K 8/4966 (2013.01); A61K 8/60 (2013.01); A61K 8/86 (2013.01); A61K 8/922 (2013.01); A61Q 17/04 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19737737 A1 19990304; DE 19737737 C2 19990923; EP 1009374 A2 20000621; JP 2001514203 A 20010911; US 6280712 B1 20010828; WO 9911235 A2 19990311; WO 9911235 A3 19990506

INPADOC legal status

2004-08-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-09-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: USE OF DI-N-OCTYLCARBONATE AND DI-2-ETHYLHEXYLCARBONATE TO INCREASE THE UV-ABSORPTION OF OCTYL METHOXYCINNAMATE

2002-04-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011012

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000219

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL