Global Patent Index - EP 1009424 A2

EP 1009424 A2 2000-06-21 - REGULATION OF MUSCLE TISSUES BY HEDGEHOG-LIKE POLYPEPTIDES, AND FORMULATIONS AND USES RELATED THERETO

Title (en)

REGULATION OF MUSCLE TISSUES BY HEDGEHOG-LIKE POLYPEPTIDES, AND FORMULATIONS AND USES RELATED THERETO

Title (de)

REGULIERUNG VON MUSKELGEWEBE MITTELS HEDGEHOG-ÄHNLICHEN POLYPEPTIDEN UND DAZU GEEIGNETE FORMULIERUNGEN UND ANWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

REGULATION DE TISSUS MUSCULAIRES PAR DES POLYPEPTIDES "HEDGEHOG", ET FORMULATIONS ET UTILISATIONS ASSOCIEES

Publication

EP 1009424 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98943462 A

Priority

  • US 9817922 W
  • US 5739497 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9910004A2] The present application relates to a method for modulating the formation and/or maintenance of muscle tissue by ectopically contacting muscle cells, especially muscle stem/progenitor cells, in vitro or in vivo, with a hedgehog therapeutic or ptc therapeutic in an amount effective to alter the growth state the treated cells, e.g., relative to the absence of administration of the hedgehog therapeutic or ptc therapeutic.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/17; A61K 31/00; A61K 31/47; A61K 31/495; A61K 31/55; A61K 31/70; C12N 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/496 (2006.01); A61K 31/553 (2006.01); A61K 38/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/472 (2013.01); A61K 31/00 (2013.01); A61K 31/4725 (2013.01); A61K 31/496 (2013.01); A61K 31/553 (2013.01); A61K 31/704 (2013.01); A61K 31/7076 (2013.01); A61K 38/17 (2013.01); A61K 38/1709 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9910004A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9910004 A2 19990304; WO 9910004 A3 19990527; AU 9125298 A 19990316; CA 2302780 A1 19990304; EP 1009424 A2 20000621

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-13 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1029743

2003-06-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021217

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020606

2002-06-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CURIS, INC.

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BLADGEN, CHRIS, S.

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CURRIE, PETER, D.

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: INGHAM, PHILIP, W.

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HUGHES, SIMON, M.

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE