Global Patent Index - EP 1009431 A1

EP 1009431 A1 2000-06-21 - HUMAN TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR RECEPTOR-LIKE 2 (TR2) ANTIBODIES

Title (en)

HUMAN TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR RECEPTOR-LIKE 2 (TR2) ANTIBODIES

Title (de)

ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN DEN MENSCHLICHEN TUMORNEKROSEFAKTOR-REZEPTOR DES TYPS 2 (TR2)

Title (fr)

ANTICORPS CONTRE LE RECEPTEUR DE TYPE 2 (TR2) DU FACTEUR DE NECROSE DES TUMEURS HUMAIN

Publication

EP 1009431 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98922245 A

Priority

  • US 9809744 W
  • US 4624997 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9851346A1] The present invention relates to antibodies to novel members of the Tumor Necrosis Factor (TNF) receptor family called TR2 receptor and their uses in pathological conditions. Hybridoma cell lines producing such mAbs, methods of in vivo imaging of pathological conditions, and methods of treating and diagnosing pathological conditions, caused by abnormal functioning, production or metabolism of TR2 receptors are also provided. In vitro assays for detecting the presence of TR2 and for evaluating the binding affinity of a test compound are also described.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 39/395; C07K 16/28; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61P 11/06 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/08 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/6863 (2013.01); C07K 16/2878 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9851346 A1 19981119; CA 2290067 A1 19981119; EP 1009431 A1 20000621; EP 1009431 A4 20000927; JP 2001524985 A 20011204

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040810

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020425

2000-09-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991213

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL