Global Patent Index - EP 1009433 A1

EP 1009433 A1 2000-06-21 - THERAPEUTIC COMPOSITION AND METHOD OF TREATMENT

Title (en)

THERAPEUTIC COMPOSITION AND METHOD OF TREATMENT

Title (de)

THERAPEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION THERAPEUTIQUE ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT

Publication

EP 1009433 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98931277 A

Priority

  • US 9812401 W
  • US 87751197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9857661A1] The present invention is methods and compositions including a photoactivated antibody that is capable of generating or increasing an immune response.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 39/395; C07K 16/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 41/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/30 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/3069 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01); A61K 2039/505 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9857661 A1 19981223; AU 732505 B2 20010426; AU 8143998 A 19990104; CA 2292912 A1 19981223; EP 1009433 A1 20000621; EP 1009433 A4 20050316; JP 2002504154 A 20020205

INPADOC legal status


2009-03-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080916

2006-03-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALTAREX MEDICAL CORPORATION

2005-03-16 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050202

2005-03-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 39/395 A

2005-03-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 16/42 B

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALTAREX MEDICAL CORP.

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991216

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE