Global Patent Index - EP 1009444 A2

EP 1009444 A2 2000-06-21 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING ARTHRITIS UTILIZING GENE THERAPY

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING ARTHRITIS UTILIZING GENE THERAPY

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ARTHRITIS DURCH GENTHERAPIE

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS ET METHODES DE TRAITEMENT DE L'ARTHRITE PAR THERAPIE GENIQUE

Publication

EP 1009444 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98945862 A

Priority

  • US 9818308 W
  • US 5603997 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9911292A2] Methods are provided for treating or preventing arthritis, comprising the general step of administering to a mammal a therapeutically effective amount of a retroviral vector which directs the expression of an anti-arthritic agent, wherein the retroviral vector is administered at a titer of greater than 10<7> cfu/ml.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 48/00; C12N 15/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/45 (2006.01); A61K 38/57 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); C12N 15/867 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/86 (2013.01); A61K 38/45 (2013.01); A61K 38/57 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C12N 2740/13052 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9911292A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9911292 A2 19990311; WO 9911292 A3 19990701; WO 9911292 A9 19990805; EP 1009444 A2 20000621; JP 2001514235 A 20010911

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040401

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MCCORMACK, JAMES, E.

2000-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHADA, SUNIL

2000-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JOLLY, DOUGLAS, J.

2000-08-30 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20000328

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MCCORMACK, JAMES, E.

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHADA, SUNIL

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JOLLY, DOUGLAS, J.

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE