Global Patent Index - EP 1009528 A1

EP 1009528 A1 2000-06-21 - IMPROVEMENTS TO RING-ROLLER CRUSHER

Title (en)

IMPROVEMENTS TO RING-ROLLER CRUSHER

Title (de)

VERBESSERUNGEN AN RINGWALZENMÜHLEN

Title (fr)

PERFECTIONNEMENTS AUX BROYEURS A ANNEAU

Publication

EP 1009528 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 97918237 A

Priority

FR 9700680 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9846356A1] The invention concerns a crusher consisting of a ring (10) with horizontal axis, means for driving the ring in rotation about its axis, at least one roller (16) whereof the axis is parallel to that of the ring and which is placed inside the latter so as to roll on its internal surface and elastic means (30) pressing the roller on the ring, the roller being supported at its ends by two arms (22) fixed on the crusher frame so as to pivot about an axis parallel to the ring axis. In order to limit the canting of the roller while limiting the crushing pressure and, thereby the mechanical stresses to acceptable values, the arms (22) are mutually linked by a torque shaft (24) parallel to the rotation axis of the arms.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 15/06 (2006.01); B02C 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 15/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9846356A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES GB GR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9846356 A1 19981022; AT 219971 T 20020715; AU 2643797 A 19981111; CA 2286563 A1 19981022; CA 2286563 C 20030408; CZ 295353 B6 20050713; CZ 9903514 A3 20000614; DE 69713814 D1 20020808; DE 69713814 T2 20030327; DK 1009528 T3 20021014; EP 1009528 A1 20000621; EP 1009528 B1 20020703; ES 2180038 T3 20030201; JP 2001518840 A 20011016; JP 3875278 B2 20070131; PL 186893 B1 20040331; PL 336309 A1 20000619; SK 139299 A3 20000612; SK 283611 B6 20031007; US 6227470 B1 20010508

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-10 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170414

2017-04-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-04-18 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20170415

2017-04-15 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69713814

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160407

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100415

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101101

2010-11-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101101

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090324

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090326

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2003-06-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2180038 T3

2002-11-13 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020403209

2002-10-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020920

2002-10-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-10-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: FCB CIMENT SOCIETE ANONYME

2002-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-08-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69713814 20020808

2002-08-07 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FCB CIMENT SOCIETE ANONYME

2002-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB GR IT LI NL

2002-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 219971 T 20020715

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011102

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990917

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB GR IT LI NL