Global Patent Index - EP 1009529 A1

EP 1009529 A1 2000-06-21 - IMPROVEMENTS TO CRUSHERS WITH RING-SHAPED TRACK AND ROLLER

Title (en)

IMPROVEMENTS TO CRUSHERS WITH RING-SHAPED TRACK AND ROLLER

Title (de)

VERBESSERUNGEN AN RINGWALZENMÜHLEN

Title (fr)

PERFECTIONNEMENTS AUX BROYEURS A PISTE ANNULAIRE ET ROULEAU

Publication

EP 1009529 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 97918239 A

Priority

FR 9700682 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9846357A1] The invention concerns a crusher comprising a ring-shaped track with horizontal axis (14), a roller (16) rolling on said track, means for pressing the roller on the track and means (18) for displacing the material from one track edge to the other so that it passes several times under the roller before it is evacuated. In order to improve the efficacy of the roller and the distribution of mechanical stresses in the roller and the track, the track (14) and the roller (16) are so designed that the space between them decreases from the track (14) edge on the side supplying the material to be crushed up to a distance from said edge not less than 80 % the track width, and that this space then quickly increases to constitute a decompression zone (19) on the side where the material is evacuated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 15/06 (2006.01); B02C 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 15/06 (2013.01); B02C 15/003 (2013.01); B02C 15/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9846357A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES GB GR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9846357 A1 19981022; AT 243563 T 20030715; AU 2643997 A 19981111; CA 2285654 A1 19981022; CA 2285654 C 20030701; CZ 295375 B6 20050713; CZ 9903492 A3 20000517; DE 69723115 D1 20030731; DE 69723115 T2 20040429; DK 1009529 T3 20030929; EP 1009529 A1 20000621; EP 1009529 B1 20030625; ES 2202603 T3 20040401; JP 2001518841 A 20011016; JP 3710829 B2 20051026; PL 186892 B1 20040331; PL 336308 A1 20000619; SK 139199 A3 20000516; US 6138933 A 20001031

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-10 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170414

2017-04-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-04-18 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20170415

2017-04-15 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69723115

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160407

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100415

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101101

2010-11-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101101

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090324

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090326

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2202603 T3

2003-10-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030403823

2003-10-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-09-29 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-08-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ING. HANS LUDESCHER, PATENTABTEILUNG DER SFS GRUPP

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69723115 P 20030731

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB GR IT LI NL

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FCB CIMENT

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990920

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB GR IT LI NL