Global patent index - EP 1009540 A1

EP 1009540 A1 2000-06-21 - DISPENSING DEVICE WITH CONICAL SOCKETING FIXING RING

Title (en)

DISPENSING DEVICE WITH CONICAL SOCKETING FIXING RING

Title (de)

ABGABEVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM EINZUSTECKENDEN KONISCHEN BEFESTIGUNGSRING

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION A BAGUE DE FIXATION A EMMANCHEMENT CONIQUE

Publication

EP 1009540 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98942800 A

Priority

  • FR 9801868 W
  • FR 9710881 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2767793A1] The invention concerns a device for dispensing a fluid product designed to be mounted in a reservoir neck (40), said device comprising: a dispensing member (2), such as a pump, comprising a body (20) and a mobile actuating rod (21) in said body; and a fixing ring (1) comprising a housing (12) for receiving said body (20) and a socketing skirt (10) to be adapted in said reservoir neck (40). The invention is characterised in that the skirt (10) outer wall (15) is provided with at least a peripheral joint sealing (14) adapted to be urged pressed against the reservoir inner wall (41).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/3047 (2013.01); B05B 11/0013 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9911387A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

FR 2767793 A1 19990305; FR 2767793 B1 19991119; DE 69832181 D1 20051208; DE 69832181 T2 20060803; EP 1009540 A1 20000621; EP 1009540 B1 20051102; ES 2252853 T3 20060516; US 6349856 B1 20020226; WO 9911387 A1 19990311

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150826

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2015-09-25 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150925

2015-08-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-05-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69832181

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-03-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69832181

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-11-27 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20141121

2014-11-04 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20141029

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130808

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130816

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130828

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130812

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-08-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69832181

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130614

2013-08-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69832181

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130614

2013-08-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69832181

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130614

2013-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69832181

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER, DE

2013-02-08 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20130104

2007-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-10-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060803

2006-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2252853

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2006-02-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060130

2005-12-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69832181

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-12-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2005-11-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040202

2003-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALOIS S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI