Global patent index - EP 1009546 A1

EP 1009546 A1 2000-06-21 - SUBSTRATE HAVING A MULTILAYER COAT AND METHOD FOR ITS PRODUCTION

Title (en)

SUBSTRATE HAVING A MULTILAYER COAT AND METHOD FOR ITS PRODUCTION

Title (de)

MIT EINEM MEHRSCHICHTÜBERZUG VERSEHENES SUBSTRAT UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

SUBSTRAT MUNI D'UN REVETEMENT MULTICOUCHE ET PROCEDE POUR SA FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1009546 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98942634 A

Priority

  • DE 19735540 A
  • EP 9804688 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9908808A1] The invention relates to a substrate having a multilayer coat and a method for its production, comprising the following stages: The car body which is to be coated is delivered to the pre-processing stage (2) via the intake (1). This is followed by electrophoretic enamelling (3) and burning in of the electrophoretic enamel coating. In stage (5), preparation takes place for coating with coating powder (stage 6). Stage (7) consists of drying with infrared radiation. This is followed by the cooling stage (8). In stage (9), the coating powder is applied to the substrate so as to form a coat. After intermediate drying (10), a protective layer is applied in stage (11) and then burnt in (stage 12). The car body is then conveyed from the installation via the exit (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 7/14 (2006.01); B05D 1/36 (2006.01); B05D 7/00 (2006.01); B05D 7/24 (2006.01); B32B 27/30 (2006.01); C09D 5/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 7/57 (2013.01); B05D 7/577 (2013.01); Y10T 428/25 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31515 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31529 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31855 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9908808A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9908808 A1 19990225; BR 9811909 A 20000815; DE 19735540 C1 19990401; EP 1009546 A1 20000621; EP 1009546 B1 20021002; ES 2185210 T3 20030416; JP 2001514966 A 20010918; JP 4217380 B2 20090128; US 2002142101 A1 20021003; US 6426147 B1 20020730; ZA 9807296 B 19990222

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090725

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090727

2010-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090727

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100331

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080718

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080729

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080807

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070710

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070730

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-08-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070824

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-07-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070719

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2185210

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59805840

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-11-07

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001201

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991222

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT