Global Patent Index - EP 1009554 A1

EP 1009554 A1 2000-06-21 - DEVICE FOR HIGH SPEED DISCHARGE OF BARS AND SECTIONS ON COOLING BED IN HOT ROLLING MILL PLANTS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR HIGH SPEED DISCHARGE OF BARS AND SECTIONS ON COOLING BED IN HOT ROLLING MILL PLANTS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHNELLEN ABFÖRDERN VON STÄBEN UND PROFILEN AUF EIN KÜJLBETT IN WALZANLAGEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE DECHARGER A VITESSE ELEVEE DES BARRES ET DES PROFILES SUR UN LIT DE REFROIDISSEMENT DANS DES INSTALLATIONS DE LAMINAGE A CHAUD

Publication

EP 1009554 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98900989 A

Priority

  • IT 9800004 W
  • IT UD970009 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9832550A1] Device for the discharge of bars and sections (5) in an underlying cooling bed (6) with respective cooling toothed plate (62), in rolling mill plants, of the type that includes movable "U" shaped channels (52) for receiving bars (1, 2, 3, 4, .....) closable by covers (51), characterised in that it is made up of the following combined characteristics: beneath said device (5), there is a transfer (61) able to receive as support said bars (1, 2, 3, 4, .....) and translate them, discharging them in an adjacent cooling toothed plate and further translation (62); to the movability of said "U" shaped channels (52) is such as to be able to lower under the support and translation plane of said transfer (61) for laying said bars (1, 2, 3, 4, .....) on the support plane of said transfer (61).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 43/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 43/00 (2006.01); B21B 43/02 (2006.01); B21B 43/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 43/003 (2013.01); B21B 43/02 (2013.01); B21B 43/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9832550A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9832550 A1 19980730; AU 5677698 A 19980818; DE 69809937 D1 20030116; DE 69809937 T2 20030717; EP 1009554 A1 20000621; EP 1009554 B1 20021204; ES 2187920 T3 20030616; IT 1290711 B1 19981210; IT UD970009 A1 19980722

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151214

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-12-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69809937

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110116

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110116

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100128

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100304

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2187920

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69809937

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-16

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020404

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990709

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB