Global patent index - EP 1009561 A1

EP 1009561 A1 2000-06-21 - A DEVICE FOR CARRYING BULK MATERIAL AND MORE PRECISELY A PORTABLE BUCKET

Title (en)

A DEVICE FOR CARRYING BULK MATERIAL AND MORE PRECISELY A PORTABLE BUCKET

Title (de)

TRAGVORRICHTUNG FÜR SCHÜTTGUT, INSBESONDERE TRAGBARER EIMER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PORTEUR POUR PRODUITS EN VRAC, NOTAMMENT SEAU PORTABLE

Publication

EP 1009561 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98940246 A

Priority

  • DE 19739118 A
  • EP 9804865 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19739118A1] The present invention relates to a device for carrying bulk material or the like, wherein said device comprises a container having a mobile suspension hoop (12') attached thereon, said suspension hoop (12') being hinged at a journal (14). In order to provide a rapid and easy fixation of the suspension hoop (12'), the journal (14) comprises a plurality of parts. The journal comprises a deformation-resistant envelope (21) as well as a resilient padding (22) provided in the hollow section of said envelope (21). These two parts (21, 22) form a single unit (20) which is attached by a rivet (40) to the outer surface (17) of the container wall (13). The rivet rod (41) extends through the container wall and is anchored inside the unit (20). The resilient padding material (22) is pressed against the outer surface (17) of the container wall (13) upon the riveting process so as to seal the slot between the bore (45) and the rivet rod (41).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21J 15/02; B65D 25/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B44D 3/12 (2006.01); B65D 25/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 25/32 (2013.01); B44D 3/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9912673A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19739118 A1 19990311; AU 8862898 A 19990329; EP 1009561 A1 20000621; EP 1009561 B1 20020109; WO 9912673 A1 19990318

INPADOC legal status

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100430

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080707

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060620

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050805

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-08-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050805

2005-08-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050805

2004-07-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040702

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020406

2002-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802853

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-02-28

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010523

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991222

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT