Global Patent Index - EP 1009565 A1

EP 1009565 A1 2000-06-21 - A METHOD OF PRODUCING A PRINTING INK-DECORATED PACKAGING MATERIAL, IN PARTICULAR FOR ASEPTIC PACKAGES

Title (en)

A METHOD OF PRODUCING A PRINTING INK-DECORATED PACKAGING MATERIAL, IN PARTICULAR FOR ASEPTIC PACKAGES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MIT DRUCKTINTE VERZIERTEN VERPACKUNGSMATERIAL, INSBESONDERE FÜR ASEPTISCHE PACKUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN MATERIAU D'EMBALLAGE DECORE A L'ENCRE D'IMPRIMERIE ET DESTINE NOTAMMENT AUX EMBALLAGES ASEPTIQUES

Publication

EP 1009565 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98923258 A

Priority

  • SE 9800870 W
  • SE 9701788 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9851437A1] The disclosure relates to a method of producing a printing ink-decorated packaging laminate for aseptic packages of the type which is produced in that a web of the packaging laminate is, for the purpose of sterilization, led through a bath of hydrogen peroxide prior to the reforming of the web into aseptic packages. The packaging laminate is produced in that a web of paper which has an outer coating of low density polyethylene (LDPE) is, for the purposes of promoting adhesion, subjected to a corona treatment modifying its polarity, whereafter the thus treated outer LDPE coating is provided with décor of water-based printing ink which is applied in the desired pattern on the outside of the coating. By subjecting the thus printing ink-decorated web to a surface energy-reducing after treatment, there will be obtained a packaging laminate which is susceptible to sterilization with considerably reduced consumption of hydrogen peroxide, at the same time as good adhesion between the water-based printing ink décor and the outer LDPE coating is ensured.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23B 27/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 27/10 (2006.01); B32B 27/32 (2006.01); B41M 1/30 (2006.01); B41M 7/00 (2006.01); B65B 53/02 (2006.01); B65B 55/10 (2006.01); B65B 61/02 (2006.01); C08J 7/00 (2006.01); C08J 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 61/025 (2013.01); B41M 1/305 (2013.01); B41M 7/0027 (2013.01); B65B 55/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9851437A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9851437 A1 19981119; AU 7559298 A 19981208; BR 9808794 A 20000718; CO 5031257 A1 20010427; DE 69812381 D1 20030424; DE 69812381 T2 20030821; EP 1009565 A1 20000621; EP 1009565 B1 20030319; ES 2195339 T3 20031201; JP 2001527475 A 20011225; JP 4159117 B2 20081001; SE 509440 C2 19990125; SE 9701788 D0 19970514; SE 9701788 L 19981115; TW 426610 B 20010321; US 6534132 B1 20030318

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100513

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100512

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110715

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100512

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100512

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090528

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090528

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090518

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090526

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-10-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69812381 P 20030424

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-03-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020426

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991214

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT