Global Patent Index - EP 1009608 A1

EP 1009608 A1 2000-06-21 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING MOULDED ARTICLES MADE OF PLASTICS, CELLULOSE OR WOOD PULP AND PROVIDED WITH CAVITIES

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING MOULDED ARTICLES MADE OF PLASTICS, CELLULOSE OR WOOD PULP AND PROVIDED WITH CAVITIES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AUS KUNST-, ZELL- ODER HOLZSTOFF BESTEHENDEN FORMTEILEN MIT HOHLRÄUMEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PIECES MOULEES MUNIES DE CAVITES, REALISEES EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE, EN CELLULOSE OU EN PATE MECANIQUE

Publication

EP 1009608 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98946251 A

Priority

  • AT 128497 A
  • DE 9802205 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9906200A1] A process for manufacturing moulded articles made of plastics, cellulose or wood pulp and provided with cavities (9), in particular composite parts for light-weight construction, by means of tool parts (1, 2), has the following steps: (a) a matrix material (5) is provided at preselected locations with inserts (7) which contain gas-developing blowing agents; and (b) the inserts (7) are caused to develop gas in the tool parts (1, 2) and expand the matrix material (5). Also disclosed are the gas-developing inserts for use in said process and made of gas-developing blowing substances enclosed in gas-tight sheaths or inserted into the matrix material (5) so as to form locally delimited regions therein. This process allows particularly light and at the same time solid tool parts to be produced, in particular composite parts for light-weight construction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29C 44/00; B29C 33/76; B32B 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 5/18 (2006.01); B29C 33/76 (2006.01); B29C 44/00 (2006.01); B29C 44/18 (2006.01); B29C 45/00 (2006.01); B29C 49/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 44/185 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9906200A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU

EPO simple patent family

WO 9906200 A1 19990211; AU 9337498 A 19990222; CA 2297934 A1 19990211; CA 2297934 C 20071211; DE 19881053 D2 20000706; EP 1009608 A1 20000621; JP 2001512059 A 20010821; US 2002157758 A1 20021031; US 6447627 B1 20020910; US 6875298 B2 20050405

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULZER CHEMTECH AG

2002-10-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ICKINGER, GEORG, DIPL.-ING.- DR.TECHN.

2002-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ICKINGER, GEORG, DR. TECHN.

2001-09-12 [18RA] DATE OF RECEIPT OF REQUEST FOR RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF RIGHTS

- Effective date: 20010725

2001-07-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010201

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000208

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000208