Global patent index - EP 1009634 A2

EP 1009634 A2 2000-06-21 - PRINTING GROUP FOR ROTOGRAVURE PRINTING PRESSES

Title (en)

PRINTING GROUP FOR ROTOGRAVURE PRINTING PRESSES

Title (de)

DRUCKGRUPPE FÜR ROTATIONSTIEFDRUCKMASCHINE

Title (fr)

GROUPE D'IMPRESSION POUR PRESSES A IMPRIMER PAR ROTOGRAVURE

Publication

EP 1009634 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 97942177 A

Priority

  • IT 9700215 W
  • IT PR960036 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9814329A2] The invention falls within the sector of rotogravure printing presses and more precisely refers to the printing group (2) which is provided with a device (8) for adjusting a doctor (7) which acts on an impression cylinder (5). The adjusting device (8) is structured so as to be controlled by a processor on which the value of the diameter of the impression cylinder and the value of the working angle of the doctor on the cylinder are preset. The printing group (2) is completely enclosed between walls which create a space inside which nozzles (41, 42, 45 and 46) for washing the entire printing group and, in particular the doctor, are housed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 9/02; B41F 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 9/02 (2006.01); B41F 9/06 (2006.01); B41F 9/10 (2006.01); B41F 9/18 (2006.01); B41F 13/00 (2006.01); B41F 31/07 (2006.01); B41F 35/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 9/061 (2013.01); B41F 9/066 (2013.01); B41F 9/1036 (2013.01); B41F 31/07 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9814329A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9814329 A2 19980409; WO 9814329 A3 19980723; AU 4395897 A 19980424; AU 720109 B2 20000525; CN 1110412 C 20030604; CN 1232426 A 19991020; DE 69710929 D1 20020411; DE 69710929 T2 20021107; EP 1009634 A2 20000621; EP 1009634 B1 20020306; ES 2174289 T3 20021101; IT 1288050 B1 19980910; IT PR960036 A1 19980330; IT PR960036 D0 19960930; JP 2001501146 A 20010130; KR 100516100 B1 20050922; KR 20000048745 A 20000725

INPADOC legal status

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080827

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080826

2009-10-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20080827

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080826

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070710

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070822

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-09-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070926

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-08-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070823

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-02-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2174289

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69710929

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-11

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHIAVI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010409

2000-10-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 41F 9/02 A, 7B 41F 9/10 B, 7B 41F 9/18 -, 7B 41F 9/06 -, 7B 41F 31/07 -

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990322

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT