Global patent index - EP 1009635 A1

EP 1009635 A1 2000-06-21 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DRIVING A PRINTING PRESS WITH AN INTEGRATED IMAGING DEVICE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DRIVING A PRINTING PRESS WITH AN INTEGRATED IMAGING DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM ANTRIEB EINER DRUCKMASCHINE MIT EINER INTEGRIERTEN BEBILDERUNGSEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR ENTRAINER UNE PRESSE D'IMPRIMERIE COMPORTANT UN SYSTEME DE FORMATION D'IMAGE INTEGRE

Publication

EP 1009635 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98936101 A

Priority

  • DE 9801528 W
  • DE 19723147 A
  • DE 19748119 A
  • DE 19807127 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9855312A1] The invention relates to a method and device for driving a printing press with at least one integrated imaging device. The aim of the invention is to provide a method and a device enabling higher imaging speed and therefore minimizing the time required for image formation. According to the invention, this is achieved by detaching the drive mechanism of the printing form cylinder (10) from the drive wheel train, by driving the printing form cylinder (10) with a drive mechanism of its own during imaging at imaging speed and by integrating the drive mechanism of the printing form cylinder (10) in the drive wheel train in an operating phase position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/008; B41C 1/18; B41F 7/10; B41F 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/10 (2006.01); B41F 13/008 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/008 (2013.01); B41F 7/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855312A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9855312 A1 19981210; EP 1009635 A1 20000621; EP 1009635 B1 20011212; US 6393987 B1 20020528

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160607

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-09-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59802466

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2005-04-06 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20050203

2002-09-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 20020729

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020325

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802466

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-24

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001122

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991108

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB