Global Patent Index - EP 1009654 A1

EP 1009654 A1 2000-06-21 - SHIP PROVIDED WITH A DISTORTION SENSOR AND DISTORTION SENSOR ARRANGEMENT FOR MEASURING THE DISTORTION OF A SHIP

Title (en)

SHIP PROVIDED WITH A DISTORTION SENSOR AND DISTORTION SENSOR ARRANGEMENT FOR MEASURING THE DISTORTION OF A SHIP

Title (de)

SYSTEM MIT EINEM VERFORMUNGSSENSOR UND VERFORMUNGSSENSORANORDNUNG ZUM MESSEN VON SCHIFFSVERFORMUNGEN

Title (fr)

NAVIRE DOTE D'UN DETECTEUR DE DISTORSION ET AGENCEMENT DE DETECTEUR DE DISTORSION DESTINE A MESURER LA DISTORSION D'UN NAVIRE

Publication

EP 1009654 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98946386 A

Priority

  • EP 9805279 W
  • NL 1006896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9911517A1] The invention relates to an improved ship, incorporating a distortion sensor arrangement (8). The measurement data supplied by the distortion sensor arrangement (8) are preferably used to correct measurement data supplied by and/or control signals for onboard directional apparatus (15, 17). The distortion sensor arrangement (8) preferably comprises a hull-mounted laser beam/light sensor (7) combination, the light sensor (7) continuously measuring a deflection of the laser beam in response to the ship distortion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 9/00; B63G 1/00; G01B 11/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 9/00 (2006.01); B63G 1/00 (2006.01); G01B 11/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63G 1/00 (2013.01); B63B 9/00 (2013.01); G01B 11/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9911517A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9911517 A1 19990311; AR 016895 A1 20010801; AU 744054 B2 20020214; AU 9344798 A 19990322; CA 2299395 A1 19990311; DE 69812116 D1 20030417; DE 69812116 T2 20031016; EP 1009654 A1 20000621; EP 1009654 B1 20030312; NL 1006896 C2 19990302; TR 200000497 T2 20000821; US 6253697 B1 20010703; ZA 9807486 B 19990226

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130812

2014-06-05 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69812116

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130812

2014-03-19 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140301

2013-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120809

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120823

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120808

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120808

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-09-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-06-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69812116 P 20030417

2003-03-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL SE

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-03-12 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-12 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2001-07-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THALES NEDERLAND B.V.

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000403

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL SE