Global Patent Index - EP 1009780 A4

EP 1009780 A4 2000-07-26 - DEICING AND ANTI-ICING COMPOSITION FOR AIRCRAFT

Title (en)

DEICING AND ANTI-ICING COMPOSITION FOR AIRCRAFT

Title (de)

ENTEISUNGS- UND VEREISUNGSSCHUTZMITTEL FÜR FLUGZEUGE

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION ANTI GIVRE ET DE DEGIVRAGE POUR AERONEFS

Publication

EP 1009780 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98914663 A

Priority

  • US 9807211 W
  • US 83799997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5817252A] A deicing and anti-icing composition for aircraft surfaces including a base compound being propylene glycol and/or ethylene glycol in the range of 35.0% to 80.0% by weight of the deicing and anti-icing composition. A diluent is included in the form of water for use as a carrier fluid for the glycol. A first molecular weight non-ionic surfactant agent is included having an HLB in the range of 4 to 17, and a second molecular weight non-ionic surfactant agent is included having an HLB in the range of 5 to 18. The second non-ionic surfactant agent has an HLB at least two (2) units higher than the first non-ionic surfactant agent. An emulsifier is included in the form of a polycarboxylate compound being in the range of 1 ppm to 0.5% by weight of the deicing and anti-icing composition. A pH control agent maintains the pH of the deicing and anti-icing composition between a 6 and 10 value.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09K 3/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09K 3/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09K 3/185 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9846695A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5817252 A 19981006; AT 203265 T 20010815; AU 6896798 A 19981111; CA 2286123 A1 19981022; DE 69801162 D1 20010823; DE 69801162 T2 20020314; DK 1009780 T3 20011105; EE 03931 B1 20021216; EE 9900496 A 20000615; EP 1009780 A1 20000621; EP 1009780 A4 20000726; EP 1009780 B1 20010718; HU 0003146 A2 20010228; HU 0003146 A3 20020328; JP 2001520694 A 20011030; KR 20010006469 A 20010126; LV 12499 A 20000620; LV 12499 B 20001120; NO 995026 A 19991123; NO 995026 D0 19991015; PL 336429 A1 20000619; RU 2196163 C2 20030110; US 5935488 A 19990810; WO 9846695 A1 19981022

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050410

2005-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-11-28 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-05-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050502

2005-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050410

2005-04-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050410

2004-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040524

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040505

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040504

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-04 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040504

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040430

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-05 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HEPP, WENGER & RYFFEL AG

2002-07-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-10 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020410

2002-04-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020410

2002-04-10 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020410

2002-04-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Free text: BO 01/51 PAGES: 265, IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER: LA MENTION DE LA NON REMISE. LA REMISE EST PUBLIEE DANS LE PRESENT BOPI.

2002-04-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-11-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-10-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011019

2001-10-18 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011018

2001-10-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011018

2001-08-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69801162 20010823

2001-08-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2001-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-07-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-07-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-07-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-07-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 203265 T 20010815

2000-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001017

2000-07-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000609

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991110

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE