Global Patent Index - EP 1009785 A1

EP 1009785 A1 2000-06-21 - METHOD FOR HIGH-TEMPERATURE SHORT-TIME DISTILLATION OF RESIDUAL OILS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR HIGH-TEMPERATURE SHORT-TIME DISTILLATION OF RESIDUAL OILS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HOCHTEMPERATUR-KURZZEIT-DESTILLATION VON RÜCKSTANDSÖLEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DISTILLATION DE COURTE DUREE A TEMPERATURE ELEVEE D'HUILES RESIDUELLES

Publication

EP 1009785 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98932111 A

Priority

  • DE 19724074 A
  • EP 9803319 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19724074A1] According to the invention, liquid residual oil from processing crude oil, natural bitumen or oil sand is mixed in a mixer with hot coke as a heat carrier (heat-carrier coke) whereby 60 to 90 weight per cent of the residual oil is evaporated. The proportion of residual oil which has not evaporated, i.e. the part containing metalliferous asphaltenes is converted to oil vapour, gas and coke in the mixture with the heat-carrier. The gases and vapours are extracted from the mixer separately from the granular coke and are subsequently cooled to obtain an oil product and gas. The coke extracted from the mixer is re-heated and returned to the mixer as a heat-carrier. The liquid residual oil is mixed with heat-carrier coke in the mixer according to a weight ratio of 1:3 to 1:30, said heat-carrier coke being at a temperature of 500 to 700 DEG C. A residual liquid film forms on the granules of heat-carrier coke as a result of this mixing process. The majority of said residual film evaporates in the mixer at a lowest possible operating temperature of 450 to 600 DEG C. The remaining residual liquid film on the coke is converted to oil vapour, gas and coke during a retention time of 6 to 60 seconds. Dry, pourable coke is extracted from the mixer, said coke being essentially free of any liquid constituents. The gases and vapours produced are extracted from the mixer after a retention time of 0.5 to 5 seconds.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 9/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 7/00 (2006.01); C10G 9/28 (2006.01); C10G 31/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 7/00 (2013.01); C10G 9/28 (2013.01); C10G 31/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855564A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19724074 A1 19981210; DE 19724074 C2 20000113; AT 212048 T 20020215; AU 8212598 A 19981221; CA 2293392 A1 19981210; CA 2293392 C 20050809; EP 1009785 A1 20000621; EP 1009785 B1 20020116; ES 2172160 T3 20020916; JP 2002503273 A 20020129; JP 4111550 B2 20080702; US 6413415 B1 20020702; WO 9855564 A1 19981210

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140604

2015-07-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150728

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-05-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-04-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59802658

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150227

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140603

2015-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 212048

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20140603

2015-01-21 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59802658

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130619

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130703

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130620

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130619

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120613

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120627

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-01-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2172160

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-07-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020406

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802658

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-02-21

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB NL

2002-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 212048

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MG TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000107

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB NL