Global patent index - EP 1009795 A1

EP 1009795 A1 2000-06-21 - DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A MANNANASE AND A PROTEASE

Title (en)

DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A MANNANASE AND A PROTEASE

Title (de)

WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT MANNANASE UND PROTEASE

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS DETERGENTES COMPRENANT UNE MANNANASE ET UNE PROTEASE

Publication

EP 1009795 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98928964 A

Priority

  • EP 98928964 A
  • EP 97870120 A
  • US 9811996 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/386

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/386 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0036 (2013.01); C11D 3/3723 (2013.01); C11D 3/386 (2013.01); C11D 3/38609 (2013.01); C11D 3/38636 (2013.01); C11D 3/38645 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9909128A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29825085 U1 20040916; EP 1009795 A1 20000621; EP 1009795 B1 20040915

INPADOC legal status

2008-08-12 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2008-06-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20071206

2008-05-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070419

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070605

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-04-24 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: MP4A

- Effective date: 20080416

2008-04-16 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20071206

2008-04-16 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20071206

2008-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070620

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070511

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070619

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-05 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070605

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-11 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070511

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-09 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070509

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-07 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070507

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-07 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070507

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070427

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-25 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070425

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070330

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-26 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070326

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-05 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060605

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060505

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-06 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060406

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: DALLI-WERKE GMBH & CO. KG

2005-10-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

2005-10-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

2005-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: DALLI-WERKE GMBH & CO. KG

2005-08-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-08-17 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: DALLI-WERKE GMBH & CO. KGPATENTANWAELTE

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-08-17 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Effective date: 20050614

2005-08-17 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-08-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: DALLI-WERKE GMBH & CO. KGPATENTANWAELTE

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-08-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Effective date: 20050614

2005-08-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-07-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: DALLI-WERKE GMBH & CO. KGPATENTANWAELTE

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-07-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: DALLI-WERKE GMBH & CO. KGPATENTANWAELTE

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2227845

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20041215

2005-01-25 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20040404352

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2005-01-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2005-01-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SERVOPATENT GMBH

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69826294

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030129

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000303

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE