Global Patent Index - EP 1009838 A2

EP 1009838 A2 2000-06-21 - METHOD FOR PROTECTING PLANTS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PROTECTING PLANTS

Title (de)

METHODE ZUM PFLANZENSCHUTZ

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PROTECTION DE PLANTES

Publication

EP 1009838 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 97954458 A

Priority

  • EP 9707253 W
  • US 3437896 P
  • US 3502497 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9829537A2] The present invention concerns a method of protecting plants from pathogen attack through synergistic disease resistance attained by applying a conventional microbicide to immunomodulated plants. Immunomodulated plants are those in which SAR is activated and are therefore referred to as "SAR-on" plants. Immunomodulated plants may be provided in at least three different ways: by applying to plants a chemical inducer of SAR such as BTH, INA, or SA; through a selective breeding program based on constitutive expression of SAR genes and/or a disease-resistant phenotype; or by transforming plants with one or more SAR genes such as a functional form of the N/M1 gene. By concurrently applying a microbicide to an immunomodulated plant, disease resistance is unexpectedly synergistically enhanced; i.e., the level of disease resistance is greater than the expected additive levels of disease resistance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/82; A01H 3/04; C07K 14/415; C12N 15/29; G01N 33/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01H 1/00 (2006.01); A01N 43/82 (2006.01); A01N 61/00 (2006.01); A01N 65/38 (2009.01); A01P 3/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/415 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/8282 (2013.01); A01N 43/82 (2013.01); A01N 61/00 (2013.01); A01N 65/08 (2013.01); C07K 14/415 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A01N 43/82 + A01N 59/20 + A01N 57/12 + A01N 53/00 + A01N 47/14 + A01N 43/90 + A01N 43/84 + A01N 43/653 + A01N 43/54 + A01N 43/40 + A01N 37/50 + A01N 37/38 + A01N 37/22
  2. A01N 61/00 + A01N 61/00 + A01N 59/20 + A01N 57/12 + A01N 53/00 + A01N 47/14 + A01N 43/90 + A01N 43/84 + A01N 43/653 + A01N 43/54 + A01N 43/40 + A01N 37/50 + A01N 37/38 + A01N 37/22
  3. A01N 43/82 + A01N 2300/00
  4. A01N 61/00 + A01N 2300/00
  5. A01N 65/00 + A01N 2300/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9829537A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9829537 A2 19980709; WO 9829537 A3 19981126; AR 010855 A1 20000712; AU 5859798 A 19980731; AU 725767 B2 20001019; CA 2275854 A1 19980709; CN 1232645 C 20051221; CN 1245537 A 20000223; EP 1009838 A2 20000621; HU 0000654 A2 20020729; HU 224480 B1 20050928; IL 130452 D0 20000601; JP 2001508288 A 20010626; TR 9901491 T2 19990823

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070605

2007-08-03 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1029801

2007-02-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070123

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990607

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE