Global Patent Index - EP 1009884 A1

EP 1009884 A1 2000-06-21 - METHOD AND SHEATHING FOR PRODUCING A GROUND COLUMN TO SUPPORT BUILDING OR TRAVELLING LOADS

Title (en)

METHOD AND SHEATHING FOR PRODUCING A GROUND COLUMN TO SUPPORT BUILDING OR TRAVELLING LOADS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND UMHÜLLUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER BODENSÄULE ZUR ABTRAGUNG VON BAUWERKS- ODER VERKEHRSLASTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET ENVELOPPE POUR PRODUIRE UNE COLONNE DE TERRE SERVANT A SUPPORTER DES CHARGES D'OUVRAGE ET DES CHARGES MOBILES

Publication

EP 1009884 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98951345 A

Priority

  • EP 98951345 A
  • EP 9805580 W
  • EP 97115299 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0900883A1] The invention relates to a method for producing ground columns (28, 86, 88) to support building or travelling loads, wherein a tubular encasing (10) is driven into the ground in a stationary zone, the ground material is removed from the tubular encasing (10), a sheathing (16) made of geotextile material is inserted into the tubular encasing (10) and filled with a load-bearing, granulated, loose material (24), the load-bearing material (24) is subsequently compacted and the tubular encasing (10) is removed. An individual jacket tube for each ground column (28, 86, 88) is driven into the ground, the jacket tube (10) is emptied by excavation, a sack-like sheathing (16) with a diameter that is larger than the diameter of the inner diameter of the tubular jacket (10) is introduced into the empty jacket tube (10) and the granulated material (24) progressively presses the sheathing (16) against the stationary supporting layer and the inner wall of the tubular jacket (10) during filling. The granulated material (24) is so compacted upon removal of the jacket tube (10) that the sheathing (16) extends beyond its original diameter until the opposing forces produced by the compacted ground around it are approximately balanced out. The material of the sheathing (16) is endowed with sufficient penetrability qualities so that no surrounding earth can penetrate into the column (28, 86, 88) thus formed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 5/66; E02D 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 3/08 (2006.01); E02D 5/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 5/665 (2013.01); E02D 3/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9911870A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0900883 A1 19990310; EP 0900883 B1 20020320; AT 206787 T 20011015; AU 9741098 A 19990322; DE 59706689 D1 20020425; DE 59801707 D1 20011115; DK 0900883 T3 20020715; DK 1009884 T3 20011119; EP 1009884 A1 20000621; EP 1009884 B1 20011010; HK 1020443 A1 20020906; NL 1010001 A1 19990305; NL 1010001 C2 19990623; WO 9911870 A1 19990311

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: JOSEF *MOBIUS BAU-GESELLSCHAFT (G.M.B.H. & CO.)

- Effective date: 20040930

2006-11-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061110

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-04-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040903

2005-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: JOSEF *MOBIUS BAU-GESELLSCHAFT (G.M.B.H. & CO.)

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040903

2004-09-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040903

2004-07-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20031022

2004-04-21 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030929

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-24 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030924

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030922

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-22 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030922

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030903

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-05 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030805

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030730

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-11-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: FRANKI GRUNDBAU GMBH

2002-09-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FRANKI GRUNDBAU GMBH

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-03-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020114

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-19 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801707 20011115

2001-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL

2001-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 206787 T 20011015

2000-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000225

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL