Global Patent Index - EP 1009885 A1

EP 1009885 A1 2000-06-21 - TIGHT MAT

Title (en)

TIGHT MAT

Title (de)

DICHTUNGSMATTE

Title (fr)

MAT D'ETANCHEITE

Publication

EP 1009885 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98947485 A

Priority

  • DE 19738169 A
  • EP 9805516 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19738169A1] The invention relates to a tight mat comprising a support strip (1); a coating (2) of swellable clay (especially bentonite) applied thereto and a cover strip (3) wherein both strips (1 and 2) are textile strips and the cover strip (3) is joined to the support strip (1) by means of stitched seams (4) which penetrate the clay coating (2) and maintain the two textile strips at a distance (1,3) from each other. If at least one textile strip (1,3) is a woven fabric or a threaded structure, the outer side of the woven fabric or threaded structure is heavily structured and is provided with homogenously distributed projections (5) or ribs (5) along the surface and protruding at least 0.2 mm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02B 3/12 (2006.01); B32B 3/16 (2006.01); B32B 5/30 (2006.01); B32B 9/00 (2006.01); E02D 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 31/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9911873A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19738169 A1 19990311; AT 221601 T 20020815; EP 1009885 A1 20000621; EP 1009885 B1 20020731; ES 2180202 T3 20030201; JP 2001514980 A 20010918; WO 9911873 A1 19990311

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-10-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090901

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2009-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081028

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080825

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080828

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080430

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050819

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-08-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040824

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040819

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-05 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2003-09-05 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-06-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2180202 T3

2003-01-06 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-10-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-09-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805026 20020905

2002-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-07-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 221601 T 20020815

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-02-20 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: WATERTIGHT MAT

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000403

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL