Global patent index - EP 1009889 A1

EP 1009889 A1 2000-06-21 - ARRANGEMENT FOR JOINING GIRDERS IN A WAY WHICH IS RESISTANT TO BENDING

Title (en)

ARRANGEMENT FOR JOINING GIRDERS IN A WAY WHICH IS RESISTANT TO BENDING

Title (de)

ANORDNUNG ZUR BIEGESTEIFEN VERBINDUNG VON TRÄGERN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR L'ASSEMBLAGE RIGIDE EN FLEXION DE POUTRES

Publication

EP 1009889 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98947393 A

Priority

  • DE 9802346 W
  • DE 19738289 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19738289C1] The connector node has a polygonal central section (3) with a base face (4), a front face (5) and side faces (6). The side faces each extend in a direction parallel or coaxial to the locked frame members (1) with four polygonal projecting bridges (7). The four bridges each have two projections (8) on their side faces which fit into correspondingly shaped grooves in the frame members to be connected. The central sections of the bridges extend beyond their side projections. the side projections are of truncated pyramidal section and taper inwardly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/24; E04B 1/19

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/24 (2006.01); E04B 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/2403 (2013.01); E04B 1/3211 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2406 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2409 (2013.01); E04B 2001/3247 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9911880A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19738289 C1 19981105; AU 9432198 A 19990322; EP 1009889 A1 20000621; EP 1009889 B1 20011010; WO 9911880 A1 19990311

INPADOC legal status

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-03-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59801708

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130930

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-05-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ANJA *RUETER

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100807

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100807

2011-03-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100831

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100805

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090728

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090831

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-06-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ANJA RUETER

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

2002-10-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-07-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2002-06-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ANJA RUETER

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

2002-04-05 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2002-01-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Free Format Text: 20011010 ANJA *RÜTER:BITTERMARKSTRASSE 70, 44229 DORTMUND

2001-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Free Format Text: 20011010 ANJA *RÜTER

2001-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59801708

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-11-15

2001-11-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20011012

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010123

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991127

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL