Global Patent Index - EP 1009891 A1

EP 1009891 A1 2000-06-21 - CONCRETE HOLLOW SLAB WITH SAFETY DEVICE

Title (en)

CONCRETE HOLLOW SLAB WITH SAFETY DEVICE

Title (de)

HOHLRAUMPLATTE AUS BETON MIT SICHERHEITSAUSRÜSTUNG

Title (fr)

DALLE ALVEOLEE EN BETON AVEC DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE

Publication

EP 1009891 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98921558 A

Priority

  • FR 9800780 W
  • FR 9705038 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2762340A1] The invention concerns a safety device for concrete hollow slabs and slabs including same, consisting of single or multiple bows (5) arranged in transverse planes at the two slab ends and optionally over the length thereof, mounted on the longitudinal reinforcing iron bars (3) and passing above part of or all the hollows (2) so as to reinforce in particular the concrete portion which is subjected to lifting forces caused by handling hooks inserted in the hollows. The invention generally concerns the industrial field involved in the construction of buildings of all types and is designed to improve the solidity and handling conditions of prefabricated slabs whether prestressed or not, made lighter by means of longitudinal cylindrical hollows.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/16 (2013.01); E04G 21/145 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848128A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2762340 A1 19981023; FR 2762340 B3 19990625; DE 69824745 D1 20040729; DE 69824745 T2 20050818; EP 1009891 A1 20000621; EP 1009891 B1 20040623; ES 2224393 T3 20050301; WO 9848128 A1 19981029

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160429

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120418

2013-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130715

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120417

2013-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120417

2012-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MICHEL DE TRETAIGNE NICOLAS

- Effective date: 20120430

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69824745

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110426

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110530

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110427

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100528

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-06-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050324

2005-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2224393 T3

2004-10-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2004-07-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69824745 P 20040729

2004-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2004-06-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040623

2003-11-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CONCRETE HOLLOW SLAB WITH SAFETY DEVICE

2003-10-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CONCRETE HOLLOW SLAB WITH SAFETY DEVICE

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010502

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991111

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT