Global Patent Index - EP 1009914 A1

EP 1009914 A1 2000-06-21 - ROTATING PISTON MACHINE

Title (en)

ROTATING PISTON MACHINE

Title (de)

DREHKOLBENMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE A PISTON ROTATIF

Publication

EP 1009914 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98941136 A

Priority

  • AT 9800204 W
  • AT 144697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9911907A1] In a rotating piston machine, a rotor rotates in a housing and slides that can be radially moved in the rotor form variable volume chambers between the housing and the rotor. An even number of slides is provided and diametrically opposed slides form a rigid unit. The invention is characterised in that the rotor is eccentrically arranged in the housing and in that the inner wall of the housing satisfies the following equation, expressed in polar co-ordinates with the centre in the rotor axis: r( psi ) = {a<2>b<2>/[a<2>cos<2>(l( psi + pi /2)) + b<2>sin<2>(l( psi + pi /2))]}<1/2>, in which b is the shortest distance between the rotor axis and the housing in the south pole (S), and a is defined by the formula a(d,b) = {[3(d/2)<4> - 2b<2>(d/2)<2>]/[2(d/2)<2> - b<2>}<1/2>, d being the length of the slide and l being defined by the formula l = 2/ pi arccos({[a<2>-(a<4>+b<4>-a<2>b<2>)<1/2>]/(a<2>-b<2>)}<1/2>).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01C 1/344; F01C 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01C 1/344 (2006.01); F01C 21/04 (2006.01); F01C 21/08 (2006.01); F01C 21/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01C 21/04 (2013.01); F01C 21/106 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9911907A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9911907 A1 19990311; AT 413423 B 20060215; AT A144697 A 20050715; AU 8963898 A 19990322; DE 59805027 D1 20020905; EP 1009914 A1 20000621; EP 1009914 B1 20020731; ES 2181259 T3 20030216; JP 2001515166 A 20010918; US 6227832 B1 20010508

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090828

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090827

2010-10-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090828

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-07-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090827

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-05-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090827

2010-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RECHBERGER MICHAEL

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070827

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080908

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080827

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080827

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20080829

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080826

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080929

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181259 T3

2003-02-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-09-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805027 20020905

2002-09-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-08-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FELBER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI

2002-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-07-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011024

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000328

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI