Global Patent Index - EP 1009931 A1

EP 1009931 A1 2000-06-21 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1009931 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99910101 A

Priority

  • DE 9900300 W
  • DE 19822896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19822896A1] The valve has a perforated disk (23) downstream of the valve seat surface (29) of a valve seat body (16), held against the valve seat body by a perforated disk carrier. The disk has a complete through passage for a fluid and at least one inlet aperture in an upper functional plane or layer, and at least one outlet aperture in a lower functional plane or layer. The disk carrier (21) has a through aperture (20) with the edge region (35) directly round it, in which there are deformations to reduce the spring rigidity of the carrier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/1853 (2013.01); F02M 61/162 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961787A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19822896 A1 19991125; EP 1009931 A1 20000621; EP 1009931 B1 20040114; JP 2002516956 A 20020611; KR 20010014189 A 20010226; US 2002060257 A1 20020523; WO 9961787 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-12-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59908299

- Effective date: 20130903

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120423

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090205

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080227

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-11-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071030

2006-02-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060215

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050205

2005-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050205

2005-01-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-10-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-02-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040227

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040227

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908299 P 20040219

2004-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-01-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021121

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000602

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI