Global Patent Index - EP 1009937 A1

EP 1009937 A1 2000-06-21 - PROTECTIVE CIRCUIT

Title (en)

PROTECTIVE CIRCUIT

Title (de)

SICHERHEITSSCHALTUNG

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT DE PROTECTION

Publication

EP 1009937 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98924022 A

Priority

  • DE 9800803 W
  • DE 19738637 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19738637A1] The invention concerns a protective circuit provided with additional switching function by exciting an electric adjusting component. The excitation signals to said adjusting component (1) are guided, between a first removable plug-type connector (2) and the adjusting component inside a housing, by means of an adapter plug (4; 17) with another removable plug-type connector, such that with the second removable plug-type connector, a protective switch (12) can be inserted in the excitation circuit of the adjusting component.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 20/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/70 (2006.01); F15B 20/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 20/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9911939A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19738637 A1 19990311; AT 268437 T 20040615; CN 1130504 C 20031210; CN 1269873 A 20001011; EP 1009937 A1 20000621; EP 1009937 B1 20040602; JP 2001515257 A 20010918; JP 4157273 B2 20081001; TW 461152 B 20011021; WO 9911939 A1 19990311

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160319

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59811516

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150330

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100319

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100319

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100319

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090318

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090324

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090323

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-05-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050303

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-07-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811516 P 20040708

2004-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2004-06-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021029

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000404

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT