Global Patent Index - EP 1009950 A1

EP 1009950 A1 2000-06-21 - REFLECTOR FOR EXTERNAL LIGHT

Title (en)

REFLECTOR FOR EXTERNAL LIGHT

Title (de)

REFLEKTORANORDNUNG FÜR AUSSENLEUCHTEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE REFLECTEUR POUR LAMPES D'ECLAIRAGE EXTERIEUR

Publication

EP 1009950 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98951241 A

Priority

  • DE 9802557 W
  • DE 19737910 A
  • DE 29715568 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9911972A1] The invention relates to a box-type reflector (1) intended for external lamps (37), in which is a tubular lamp with its socket (36), especially a high pressure discharge lamp such as a high pressure sodium vapour lamp, burns in a horizontal position, the reflector unit (1) being delimited lengthwise (30), in reference to the longitudinal axis of the lamp, by front walls (21, 21', 22, 22'), and crosswise (11) by the sidewalls (4, 4', 5, 5', 6, 6'), the transversal axis (11) defining the inside width of the sidewalls. Inside the external lamp, the reflector unit (1) is mounted longitudinally (30) moveable relative to the socket (36), and/or at least part of each reflecting sidewall (4, 4', 5, 5', 6, 6') is formed by part of the reflector or by concave metal-coated side strips which are secured tilting in an adjustable manner on the upper and/or lower longitudinal edge, so that the inclination of the side strips (14, 15) can be adjusted relative to the transversal axis (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 17/02; F21V 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 7/09 (2006.01); F21V 7/16 (2006.01); F21V 17/02 (2006.01); F21V 17/10 (2006.01); F21V 17/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/164 (2013.01); F21V 7/16 (2013.01); F21V 14/04 (2013.01); F21V 17/02 (2013.01); F21V 17/107 (2013.01); F21V 17/16 (2013.01); F21W 2131/10 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9911972 A1 19990311; AT 241110 T 20030615; AU 9735698 A 19990322; EP 1009950 A1 20000621; EP 1009950 B1 20030521; ES 2200381 T3 20040301; IL 134826 D0 20010520

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2009-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070901

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ABELE + GEIGER G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20070831

2006-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060830

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060829

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060828

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060828

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-21 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060821

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050819

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040224

2004-04-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200381 T3

2003-10-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2003-05-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020211

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000229

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE