Global Patent Index - EP 1009995 A1

EP 1009995 A1 2000-06-21 - MICROFLUIDIC SYSTEM WITH ELECTROFLUIDIC AND ELECTROTHERMAL CONTROLS

Title (en)

MICROFLUIDIC SYSTEM WITH ELECTROFLUIDIC AND ELECTROTHERMAL CONTROLS

Title (de)

MIKROFLUIDISCHES SYSTEM MIT ELEKTROFLUIDISCHER UND ELEKTROTHERMISCHER REGELUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME MICROFLUIDIQUE A REGULATION ELECTROFLUIDIQUE ET ELECTROTHERMIQUE

Publication

EP 1009995 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98944596 A

Priority

  • US 5605897 P
  • US 97752897 A
  • US 8353298 P
  • US 9817910 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9912016A1] A method and device for tranporting and/or monitoring a fluid in a multi-port device used in a microfluidic system is provided. The multi-port device includes a substrate comprising a defined channel configuration. A first channel region having a first port and a second port for transporting fluid therebetween is defined in the substrate. A second channel region having a first port and a second port for applying an electric current for heating fluid or for monitoring a fluid parameter therebetween is also defined in the substrate. In some embodiments, the first channel intersects with the second channel. The heating or monitoring aspect of the invention can be used with a variety of biological reactions including polymerase chain reaction and ligase chain reaction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 21/00; C12M 1/00; C12P 19/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/447 (2006.01); G01N 31/20 (2006.01); B01L 3/00 (2006.01); B01L 7/00 (2006.01); C12M 1/00 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01L 3/5027 (2013.01); B01L 7/52 (2013.01); G01N 27/44791 (2013.01); B01L 2200/147 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0816 (2013.01); B01L 2300/1822 (2013.01); B01L 2300/1827 (2013.01); B01L 2300/1833 (2013.01); B01L 2300/1838 (2013.01); B01L 2400/0415 (2013.01); B01L 2400/0487 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9912016 A1 19990311; AU 746098 B2 20020418; AU 9210398 A 19990322; CA 2300203 A1 19990311; EP 1009995 A1 20000621; EP 1009995 A4 20070502; JP 2001515204 A 20010918

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20081021

2007-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070719

2007-05-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20070322

2007-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: G01N 27/447 20060101AFI20070316BHEP

2007-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: B01L 7/00 20060101ALI20070316BHEP

2007-04-13 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1028640

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CALIPER LIFE SCIENCES, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-04-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CALIPER LIFE SCIENCES, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CALIPER LIFE SCIENCE, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CALIPER TECHNOLOGIES, CORP.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE