Global Patent Index - EP 1010004 A1

EP 1010004 A1 2000-06-21 - AUTOMATED PARALLEL CAPILLARY ELECTROPHORETIC SYSTEM

Title (en)

AUTOMATED PARALLEL CAPILLARY ELECTROPHORETIC SYSTEM

Title (de)

AUTOMATISCHE PARALLELKOPILLARELEKTROFORESEVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ELECTROPHORETIQUE CAPILLAIRE PARALLEL AUTOMATIQUE

Publication

EP 1010004 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98933038 A

Priority

  • US 9813667 W
  • US 5383697 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9900664A1] An automated electrophoretic system (30) that employs a capillary cartridge having a plurality of capillary tubes (32). The cartridge has a first array of capillary ends projecting from one side of a microtitre plate (68) so as to simultaneously perform capillary electrophoresis on samples present in each of the wells of the plate. The system includes a stacked dual carousel arrangement, gel delivery module, multi-wavelength beam generator (52), and off-line capillary reconditioner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 27/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/447 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/44782 (2013.01); G01N 27/44721 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9900664 A1 19990107; CA 2295227 A1 19990107; CA 2295227 C 20040907; EP 1010004 A1 20000621; EP 1010004 A4 20020403; JP 2003524747 A 20030819; JP 4121698 B2 20080723

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070103

2005-11-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SPECTRUMEDIX LLC

2005-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041227

2002-04-03 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020219

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 01N 27/26 A, 7G 01N 27/447 B

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000121

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE