Global Patent Index - EP 1010042 A1

EP 1010042 A1 2000-06-21 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THREE-DIMENSIONAL IMAGING

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THREE-DIMENSIONAL IMAGING

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR DREIDIMENSIONALEN BILDERZEUGUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'IMAGERIE EN TROIS DIMENSIONS

Publication

EP 1010042 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97939753 A

Priority

US 9715447 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9912079A1] A system and method for three-dimensional imaging utilize a lens (34) to perform a two-dimensional Fourier transform of an interference pattern while focusing the pattern on a two-dimensional detector array (40) which is positioned in the image plane (38) of the lens. This allows immediate previewing of the imaged object for proper positioning. Coherent energy beams are utilized to create a series of interference patterns, or image-plane holograms, each at a different frequency of the source energy beams. Furthermore, at each frequency, the relative phase between an object and a reference energy beam is varied to capture the complex values associated with the interference patterns. After capturing and storing the various interference patterns, a computer (42) performs a one-dimensional Fourier transform, or other simplified processing to generate the three-dimensional image of the object. The image resolution extends to the micron range making this system and method easily adaptable to a variety of three-dimensional inspection applications.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03H 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 11/24 (2006.01); G03H 1/16 (2006.01); G03H 1/22 (2006.01); G06T 1/00 (2006.01); H04N 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03H 1/08 (2013.01); G03H 1/0443 (2013.01); G03H 1/0406 (2013.01); G03H 3/00 (2013.01); G03H 2001/0033 (2013.01); G03H 2001/0447 (2013.01); G03H 2001/0458 (2013.01); G03H 2001/0469 (2013.01); G03H 2001/0471 (2013.01); G03H 2222/13 (2013.01); G03H 2226/11 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9912079A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9912079 A1 19990311; AU 4177397 A 19990322; EP 1010042 A1 20000621; JP 2001515227 A 20010918

INPADOC legal status


2012-11-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120525

2010-11-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COHERIX, INC.

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030121

2000-08-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VERIDIAN ERIM INTERNATIONAL, INC.

2000-07-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MARRON, JOSEPH, C.

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE