Global Patent Index - EP 1010048 A1

EP 1010048 A1 2000-06-21 - VOLTAGE REGULATING CIRCUIT FOR ELIMINATING "LATCH-UP

Title (en)

VOLTAGE REGULATING CIRCUIT FOR ELIMINATING "LATCH-UP

Title (de)

SPANNUNGSREGELUNGSSCHALTUNG ZUR UNTERDRÜCKUNG DES LATCH-UP PHÄNOMEN

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT DE REGULATION DE TENSION DESTINE A SUPPRIMER UN PHENOMENE DIT "LATCH-UP"

Publication

EP 1010048 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98929294 A

Priority

  • EP 98929294 A
  • EP 9802749 W
  • EP 97107722 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0878752A1] The voltage regulator has a series bipolar transistor (2) to adjust the voltage output. The base voltage of the transistor is controlled by a resistor (5) and Zener diode (6) connected across the unregulated potential source, with the base connected to the junction between the resistor and the Zener diode. In addition, a voltage detector circuit (11) is connected across the regulated output and is also connected to the base of the transistor. The voltage detector causes the transistor to switch to the blocking state when latch up occurs. Filter capacitors (3,9) are fitted across the unregulated and the regulated supplies.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05F 1/00; G05F 1/575

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 23/62 (2006.01); G05F 1/00 (2006.01); G05F 1/10 (2006.01); G05F 1/56 (2006.01); G05F 1/575 (2006.01); H02J 1/00 (2006.01); H03K 17/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05F 1/575 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9852111A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0878752 A1 19981118; AT 217102 T 20020515; CA 2289935 A1 19981119; DE 69805188 D1 20020606; DE 69805188 T2 20021128; EP 1010048 A1 20000621; EP 1010048 B1 20020502; JP 2001525091 A 20011204; KR 20010012426 A 20010215; US 6184664 B1 20010206; WO 9852111 A1 19981119

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-02-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20031201

2004-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040130

2003-12-31 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030511

2003-12-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031202

2003-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *EM MICROELECTRONIC-MARIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030511

2003-05-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030511

2003-04-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030204

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020720

2002-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020731

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-07-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020725

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-07-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020724

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-07-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020718

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-07-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020703

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020628

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69805188

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-06

2002-05-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB NL

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 217102

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010606

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991213

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB NL