Global Patent Index - EP 1010157 A1

EP 1010157 A1 2000-06-21 - SCREWING TOOL

Title (en)

SCREWING TOOL

Title (de)

SCHRAUBWERKZEUG

Title (fr)

OUTIL DE VISSAGE

Publication

EP 1010157 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98945272 A

Priority

  • DE 29715822 U
  • EP 9805302 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9912145A1] The present invention relates to a screwing tool made of hardened steel such as a screw-driver insert. This tool comprises a screwing head (4) followed by a neck (6) bearing an identification mark, as well as a torque transmission section (2) extending on the other side of said neck. According to this invention and in order to provide an optimal shape for use, the identification mark comprises symbols (18) which can be distinguished from each other by an angular offset movement in the circumferential direction, or which are arranged so as to be distinguished from each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/00; B25B 13/56; B25B 15/00; B25B 23/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 15/00 (2006.01); B25B 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 15/001 (2013.01); B25B 15/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9912145A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

DE 29715822 U1 19990114; AU 9264098 A 19990322; EP 1010157 A1 20000621; EP 1010157 B1 20020605; JP 2001520124 A 20011030; WO 9912145 A1 19990311; WO 9912145 B1 19990520

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-05-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120430

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100818

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-08-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804343 20020711

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010412

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000327

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR