Global Patent Index - EP 1010187 A1

EP 1010187 A1 2000-06-21 - POWER CIRCUIT BREAKER WITH AN ACTUATING SHAFT

Title (en)

POWER CIRCUIT BREAKER WITH AN ACTUATING SHAFT

Title (de)

NIEDERSPANNUNGS-LEISTUNGSSCHALTER MIT EINER SCHALTWELLE

Title (fr)

DISJONCTEUR DE PUISSANCE BASSE TENSION A ARBRE DE COMMANDE

Publication

EP 1010187 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98954164 A

Priority

  • DE 9802693 W
  • DE 19739702 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19739702C1] A low voltage circuit-breaker, including a contact arrangement (19), a drive device (20) for actuating the contact arrangement, as well as including a switch-shaft (2) for transmitting a driving force from the drive device (20) to the contact arrangement (19), and to a bearing arrangement receiving the switch-shaft (2). The bearing arrangement for the switch-shaft has as least one bearing body (1) connected to a pole-module receiving the contact arrangement (19). The bearing arrangement has specifically at least three bearing bodies tightly and force-transmissively joined to one wall (3) of the pole-module (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 3/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/40 (2006.01); H01H 3/32 (2006.01); H01H 71/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/32 (2013.01); H01H 2003/326 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9912175A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19739702 C1 19981210; CN 1138290 C 20040211; CN 1273679 A 20001115; EP 1010187 A1 20000621; EP 1010187 B1 20011219; HK 1029866 A1 20040709; JP 2001515259 A 20010918; US 2002053963 A1 20020509; US 6492888 B2 20021210; WO 9912175 A1 19990311

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091008

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100904

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802559

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100904

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100904

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090929

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091120

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090910

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020321

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802559 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DAHL, JOEG-UWE

2001-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GODESA, LUDVIK

2001-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LIEBETRUTH, MARC

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010504

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000302

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT