Global Patent Index - EP 1010188 A1

EP 1010188 A1 2000-06-21 - CONTROL DEVICE

Title (en)

CONTROL DEVICE

Title (de)

STEUERVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE

Publication

EP 1010188 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97913215 A

Priority

  • FI 9700716 W
  • FI 964687 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9824101A1] The present invention relates to a control device in which a spring means controls switching means in a switching device. Such a device is used e.g. in connection with load separators or disconnector equipment. In addition to the spring means, the device of the invention comprises a release spring means (4) for returning the switching means to "Open" position in possible malfunction of the switching device or when remote control is used. In the device of the invention, the control shaft charging the release spring (4) is also provided with a release mechanism for releasing the coupling between the manual control and the release spring of the device after the charging is complete.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/16; H01H 3/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9824101A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9824101 A1 19980604; AU 5054998 A 19980622; DE 69729894 D1 20040819; DE 69729894 T2 20050721; EP 1010188 A1 20000621; EP 1010188 B1 20040714; ES 2224225 T3 20050301; FI 101435 B1 19980615; FI 101435 B 19980615; FI 964687 A0 19961125; NO 318040 B1 20050124; NO 992506 A 19990525; NO 992506 D0 19990525

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151111

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-07-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2224225 T3

2005-01-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69729894 P 20040819

2004-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-07-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-07-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-06-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB TECHNOLOGY AG

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030408

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990528

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT