Global patent index - EP 1010194 A1

EP 1010194 A1 2000-06-21 - VACUUM SPUTTERING APPARATUS

Title (en)

VACUUM SPUTTERING APPARATUS

Title (de)

VACUUMZERSTÄUBUNGSGERÄT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PULVERISATION SOUS VIDE

Publication

EP 1010194 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98940464 A

Priority

  • GB 9802642 W
  • GB 9718947 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9913491A1] A vacuum sputtering apparatus (1) is described in which a target (7) having a target face (8) is mounted in a vacuum chamber (2) opposite a substrate (15). A magnetic pole plate (16) having a non-magnetic carrier plate (17) attached thereto is mounted behind the target (7) on a shaft (28) and can be rotated by means of a motor (29) about an axis substantially orthogonal to the target face (8). Carrier plate (17) has an array of holes (19) each of which can receive a corresponding first bar magnet (20, 21). There are fewer magnets (20, 21) than there are holes (19) and the magnets (20, 21) are removable from their holes (19). Carrier plate (17) also has a circumferential line of holes (22), in each of which may be mounted a corresponding second bar magnet (23). By varying the number and positions of the bar magnets (20, 21, 23) in the holes (19, 22) a variety of different high density plasma zone shapes (24; 25, 26; 27; 28) can be produced upon the target face (8). Conveniently, the bar magnets (20, 21, 23) are round in section but can alternatively be of square or hexagonal section, if desired.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 37/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 14/35 (2006.01); H01J 37/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 37/3452 (2013.01); H01J 37/3408 (2013.01); H01J 37/3455 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9913491A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9913491 A1 19990318; DE 69828699 D1 20050224; DE 69828699 T2 20060427; EP 1010194 A1 20000621; EP 1010194 B1 20050119; GB 9718947 D0 19971112; JP 2001515966 A 20010925; JP 4306958 B2 20090805; US 6132576 A 20001017

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-01-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051020

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-07-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2005-04-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050419

2005-04-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050419

2005-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69828699

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-02-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

2005-01-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-01-19 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050119

2005-01-19 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050119

2005-01-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050119

2005-01-19 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050119

2005-01-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050119

2004-11-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NORDIKO TECHNICAL SERVICES LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000201

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE