Global Patent Index - EP 1010218 A2

EP 1010218 A2 2000-06-21 - SHROUD RETENTION WAFER

Title (en)

SHROUD RETENTION WAFER

Title (de)

HÜLLENHALTERUNGSPLATTE

Title (fr)

PLAQUETTE DE RETENUE A ENVELOPPE

Publication

EP 1010218 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98921226 A

Priority

  • US 9809946 W
  • US 4662197 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9852253A2] An insulative shroud retention wafer including a planar base member. There are also first, second, third and fourth cylindrical members which each have an axial pin receiving aperture and an axial center line extending through the pin receiving aperture. These cylindrical members extend from the first side of the planar base member and the cylindrical members are positioned in an arrangement such that a first longitudinal center line extends through the axial center line of the first and second cylindrical members. A second longitudinal center line extends in parallel spaced retention to the first longitudinal center line through the axial center lines of the third and fourth cylindrical members. A first transverse center line extends through the center lines of the first and third cylindrical members. A second traverse center line extends through the center line of the second and fourth cylindrical members. A protuberance is peripherally positioned on the first cylinder at least in part at a position between the first longitudinal center line and the first transverse center line. This arrangement maximizes the number of cylindrical members on the wafer. The wafer may be mounted on a header prior to shipment to the user thus saving the user time and effort in his manufacturing operation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 23/72

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/76 (2006.01); H01R 12/50 (2011.01); H01R 12/70 (2011.01); H01R 43/18 (2006.01); H01R 12/71 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/7005 (2013.01); H01R 13/64 (2013.01); H01R 12/712 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9852253 A2 19981119; WO 9852253 A3 19990325; DE 69809071 D1 20021205; DE 69809071 T2 20030612; EP 1010218 A2 20000621; EP 1010218 A4 20000628; EP 1010218 B1 20021030; ES 2186156 T3 20030501; JP 2001525979 A 20011211

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160506

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-02-19 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Ref Legal Event Code: R079

- Ref Document Number: 69809071

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Free Format Text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H01R0012220000

- IPC: H01R0012500000

- Effective date: 20150113

2015-02-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FCI ASIA PTE. LTD, SG

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69809071

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150113

2015-02-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69809071

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20150113

2015-02-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69809071

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20150113

2015-01-13 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Ref Legal Event Code: R079

- Ref Document Number: 69809071

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Free Format Text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H01R0012220000

- IPC: H01R0012500000

2015-01-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69809071

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130516

2014-06-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140610

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130515

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-02-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130515

2014-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130515

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130515

2013-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FCI

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20130531

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120511

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120607

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120518

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120510

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120507

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120426

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FCI ASIA PTE. LTD, SG

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69809071

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-06-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FCI, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69809071

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69809071

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69809071

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69809071

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120419

2011-07-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *FCI18 PARC ARIANE III 3-5 RUE ALFRED KASTLER,F-7

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Effective date: 20110712

2011-05-20 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2004-03-10 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2003-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-05-23 [ET1] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** REVISION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE PATENT OR THE CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET1

2003-05-15 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2186156

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-02-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030130

2002-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69809071

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-05

2002-11-27 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2002-10-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-10-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FCI

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-09-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FCI

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 12/22 A

2001-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-06-28 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000512

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991206

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE