Global patent index - EP 1010261 A1

EP 1010261 A1 2000-06-21 - DATA TRANSMISSION SYSTEM WITH RELAY STATIONS BETWEEN A SOURCE STATION AND A TARGET STATION

Title (en)

DATA TRANSMISSION SYSTEM WITH RELAY STATIONS BETWEEN A SOURCE STATION AND A TARGET STATION

Title (de)

DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM MIT RELAISSTATIONEN ZWISCHEN EINER QUELLSTATION UND EINER ZIELSTATION

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES AVEC STATIONS RELAIS INSTALLEES ENTRE UNE STATION SOURCE ET UNE STATION CIBLE

Publication

EP 1010261 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98951322 A

Priority

  • DE 19737897 A
  • EP 9805451 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19737897A1] A decentralized digital data transmission system has a large number of distributed stations which can only engage in direct data communication with neighbouring stations. Stations located between a source station and a target station function as relay stations. Station to station transmission occurs in each case on different channels. In each station signals received by a reception channel are converted onto a different transmission channel. Conversion of a bit flow or symbol flow arriving at said reception channel is carried out on a bit-by-bit or symbol-by-symbol basis so that data is transmitted in a continuous flow without long delays occurring during conversion as is the case for transmission of data packets. A coupling matrix (KM) is used for conversion. Each channel (C1...Cn) is divided into a plurality of sub-channels (CH-1...CH-8). Transmission channels are allocated in such a way that each station uses wherever possible only sub-channels (SC1...SC8) located in the same channel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 7/155; H04L 12/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 29/02 (2006.01); H04B 7/155 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04B 7/15528 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13098 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13174 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13191 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13291 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13342 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13367 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9912279A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19737897 A1 19990325; DE 19737897 C2 19990722; AU 9739598 A 19990322; CA 2302501 A1 19990311; CN 1269076 A 20001004; CZ 20000672 A3 20000712; CZ 288768 B6 20010815; EP 1010261 A1 20000621; HU 0002405 A2 20001128; HU 0002405 A3 20030128; IL 134265 D0 20010430; JP 2001515297 A 20010918; WO 9912279 A1 19990311

INPADOC legal status

2005-07-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021204

2005-01-19 [32PN] PUBLIC NOTIFICATION UNDER RULE 80 EPC

- Ref Legal Event Code: 32PN

- Free Format Text: FESTSTELLUNG EINES RECHTSVERLUSTES DATIERT VOM 22.07.2003 LETZTE ANSCHRIFT: BORSIGSTRASSE 13, 40880 RATINGEN, ALLEMAGNE

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020724

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000125

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE