Global Patent Index - EP 1010272 A2

EP 1010272 A2 2000-06-21 - APPARATUS FOR WIRELESS TRANSFER OF VIDEO FROM A COMPUTER TO A TELEVISION SET

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR WIRELESS TRANSFER OF VIDEO FROM A COMPUTER TO A TELEVISION SET

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR DRAHTLOSEN VIDEOÜBERTRAGUNG VON EINEM COMPUTER ZU EINEM FERNSEHGERÄT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE TRANSFERT RADIO DE LA VIDEO D'UN ORDINATEUR A UN POSTE DE TELEVISION

Publication

EP 1010272 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98940525 A

Priority

  • IL 9800400 W
  • IL 12163697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9910999A2] A system for providing the output of a computer to a television set via wireless channel within a building is provided. The system includes a transmission antenna unit, a transmission processor, a reception antenna unit and a reception processor. The transmission processor is connected between the computer and the transmission antenna unit and converts the computer output to a composite video signal, upconverts the composite video signal to a carrier frequency not within a range reserved for television transmissions and provides the upconverted signal to the transmission antenna for transmission within the building. The reception antenna unit has at least one set of two, differently polarized reception antennas and receives the transmitted signal. The reception processor processes and combines the output of the two antennas of each set and adapts the processing in accordance with the quality of the output.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 5/00 (2006.01); H01Q 3/00 (2006.01); H01Q 3/24 (2006.01); H01Q 21/24 (2006.01); H01Q 25/00 (2006.01); H04B 7/10 (2006.01); H04N 5/38 (2006.01); H04N 5/44 (2011.01); H04N 9/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/38 (2013.01); H04B 7/10 (2013.01); H04N 5/44 (2013.01); H04N 21/4113 (2013.01); H04N 21/43637 (2013.01); H04N 9/641 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9910999 A2 19990304; WO 9910999 A3 19990520; AU 8882898 A 19990316; BR 9814443 A 20011023; CA 2301578 A1 19990304; CN 1164111 C 20040825; CN 1276945 A 20001213; EP 1010272 A2 20000621; EP 1010272 A4 20050928; IL 121636 A 20000831; IL 121636 D0 19980208

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061221

2006-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051214

2006-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CREATIVE TECHNOLOGY LTD.

2005-09-28 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050816

2005-09-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04H 1/00 A

2005-09-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 09G 5/00 B

2005-09-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04B 7/10 B

2005-09-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01Q 21/24 B

2005-09-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01Q 25/00 B

2005-09-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01Q 3/00 B

2005-09-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01Q 3/24 B

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000222

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE