Global Patent Index - EP 1010388 A1

EP 1010388 A1 2000-06-21 - Floor cleaning apparatus

Title (en)

Floor cleaning apparatus

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Bodenreinigung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour nettoyer des sols

Publication

EP 1010388 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113381 A

Priority

DE 19858228 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a handle (3) on a housing (1), whereby the handle can be pivoted about an axis (A) from one position into at least a second position in which defined functions can be triggered. In the first position the handle forms an essentially uniform continuation of the housing contour and it protrudes in the second position.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zur Bodenreinigung, insbesondere einen Staubsauger, wobei an einem Gehäuse 1 ein verschwenkbarer Griff 3 angebracht ist. Der Griff (3) ist als Multifunktionsgriff ausgebildet und kann zur Betätigung eines Ein-/Ausschalters, zur Ver-/Entriegelung eines Gehäusedeckels, zur Entriegelung der Kabeltrommelbremse etc. verwendet werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/32; A47L 9/26; A47L 9/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/26 (2006.01); A47L 9/28 (2006.01); A47L 9/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/2863 (2013.01); A47L 9/26 (2013.01); A47L 9/2836 (2013.01); A47L 9/2842 (2013.01); A47L 9/2852 (2013.01); A47L 9/327 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010388 A1 20000621; EP 1010388 B1 20100106; DE 59915122 D1 20100225; ES 2339410 T3 20100519

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160715

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-12-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101007

2010-05-19 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2339410 T3

2010-02-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59915122 P 20100225

2010-01-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070202

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI