Global Patent Index - EP 1010441 A3

EP 1010441 A3 2000-09-06 - Fire sprinkler systems

Title (en)

Fire sprinkler systems

Title (de)

Feuerlöschsprinkeranlage

Title (fr)

Système de têtes d'extinction d'incendie

Publication

EP 1010441 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99124665 A

Priority

GB 9827434 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1010441A2] A fire sprinkler system comprising at least one sprinkler; break tank means (8; 107), for receiving water from a mains water supply; pump means (11, 12, 13; 109) for supplying water from said break tank means to said at least one sprinkler; means (70; 117) for providing water to said at least one sprinkler from said mains water supply other than by way of said break tank means, and including check valve means (71; 118) for preventing reverse flow of water to said mains water supply; and pressure detection means (20, 21, 22) operable to detect pressure of water supplied to the or one or more of said at least one sprinkler, and operable to cause said pump means to be operated when said pressure is below a predetermined value. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 35/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 35/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 35/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010441 A2 20000621; EP 1010441 A3 20000906; GB 2344762 A 20000621; GB 9827434 D0 19990203

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI