Global Patent Index - EP 1010466 A1

EP 1010466 A1 2000-06-21 - BREAKING APPARATUS

Title (en)

BREAKING APPARATUS

Title (de)

ZERKLEINERUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE DESAGREGATION

Publication

EP 1010466 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98935276 A

Priority

  • JP 9803389 W
  • JP 24009997 A

Abstract (en)

A thin metal wire 8 is fused and vaporized by a predetermined amount of electrical energy supplied to the thin metal wire 8 for a short period of time, whereby a blasting substance 3 is expanded in volume. Therefore, a vaporization expansion force caused by the fusion and vaporization of the thin metal wire 8 moves a shock delivering member 22, so that the shock delivering member 22, colliding with a to-be-blasted object H1, delivers a shock to the to-be-blasted object H1, thereby blasting the to-be-blasted object H1. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42D 3/04 (2006.01); B02C 1/00 (2006.01); B02C 19/00 (2006.01); B02C 19/18 (2006.01); E04G 23/08 (2006.01); E21C 37/18 (2006.01); F42B 3/00 (2006.01); F42D 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 19/18 (2013.01); E04G 23/083 (2013.01); E04G 23/08 (2013.01); F42B 3/006 (2013.01); F42D 3/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010466 A1 20000621; EP 1010466 A4 20010829; CN 1269735 A 20001011; JP 3249073 B2 20020121; JP H1176854 A 19990323; RU 2183271 C2 20020610; WO 9912648 A1 19990318; ZA 9808071 B 19990309

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020116

2001-08-29 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010717

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): CH GB LI

2001-08-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 02C 19/00 A, 7B 02C 19/18 B

2000-10-04 [K1C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-09-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH GB LI

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH GB LI