Global Patent Index - EP 1010469 A2

EP 1010469 A2 2000-06-21 - Process and system for supplying paint to an electrostatic coating installation

Title (en)

Process and system for supplying paint to an electrostatic coating installation

Title (de)

Verfahren und System zur Farbversorgung einer elektrostatischen Beschichtungsanlage

Title (fr)

Système et procédé d'alimentation en peinture d'une installation de revêtement électrostatique

Publication

EP 1010469 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99123855 A

Priority

DE 19858397 A

Abstract (en)

Exchangeable containers are movable by a gripping device (26), insulated against earth to the material removal point (1,2), supplied with high voltage from the spraying unit (10), across an insulated stretch (30). The gap is sufficient for ensuring the high voltage insulation of the material removal point (1,2). The containers are movable linearly across the insulated stretch.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem mit auswechselbaren kartuschenartigen Behältern für leitfähiges Beschichtungsmaterial arbeitenden Farbversorgungssystem für eine elektrostatische Sprüheinrichtung werden die Kartuschen von an einem Isolierarm (25) angeordneten Greifern (26) aus einem geerdeten Behälterwechselbereich (20) über eine Isolierstrecke (30) hinweg in zwei Materialentnahmestellen (1,2) eingesetzt, die von der Sprüheinrichtung (10) über isolierte Farbschläuche (14,15) kontinuierlich auf Hochspannung gelegt sind. Bei abwechselnder Versorgung der Sprüheinrichtung aus zwei in die beiden Materialentnahmestellen (1,2) eingesetzten Kartuschen ist kontinuierlicher Beschichtungsbetrieb möglich, wobei während der Materialentnahme aus der einen Kartusche die jeweils andere Kartusche nachgefüllt oder gegen eine volle Kartusche ausgewechselt werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 5/16; B05B 12/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 5/1633 (2013.01); B05B 12/1463 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010469 A2 20000621; EP 1010469 A3 20030205; EP 1010469 B1 20061102; AT 344103 T 20061115; DE 19858397 A1 20000621; DE 59913959 D1 20061214; ES 2274601 T3 20070516

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DUERR SYSTEMS AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DUERR SYSTEMS AG, 74321 BIETIGHEIM-BISSINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 59913959

2017-03-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59913959

- Representative's name: V. BEZOLD & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE - PARTG MBB, DE

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DUERR SYSTEMS AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DUERR SYSTEMS GMBH, 74321 BIETIGHEIM-BISSINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 59913959

2016-09-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59913959

- Representative's name: V. BEZOLD & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE - PARTG MBB, DE

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061102

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070203

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2007-10-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070803

2007-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-06-27 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2007-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2274601 T3

2007-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-04-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070402

2007-02-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070125

2007-02-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-02-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070202

2006-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913959 P 20061214

2006-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-11-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-11-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-11-02 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061102

2006-11-02 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061102

2006-10-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DUERR SYSTEMS GMBH

2003-10-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI