Global Patent Index - EP 1010473 A2

EP 1010473 A2 2000-06-21 - Device and method for coating a even substrate

Title (en)

Device and method for coating a even substrate

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Beschichten eines ebenen Substrates

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de revêtement d'un substrat plan

Publication

EP 1010473 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99811153 A

Priority

CH 249698 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a coating module (2) with a capillary column filled with a liquid coating medium and with an opening past which the surface to be coated is moved at a relatively small distance so that a coating is deposited onto the surface. The capillary column is open at the bottom and is filled with coating medium via a supply chamber (25,27). The substrate (23) is passed beneath the opening of the column with the surface (23a) to be coated facing upwards. An Independent claim is also included for a method of coating a flat substrate.

Abstract (de)

Die Vorrichtung weist ein Beschichtungsmodul mit einem Kapillarspalt (8) auf. Der Kapillarspalt (8) ist mit einem flüssigen Beschichtungsmedium (28) gefüllt und weist eine Öffnung (9) auf. Eine zu beschichtende Oberfläche (23a) des Substrates (23) ist in vergleichsweise kleinem Abstand am Kapillarspalt (8) vorbeizuführen, so dass sich eine Schicht (43) auf der genannten Oberfläche (23a) abscheidet. Der Kapillarspalt (8) ist unten offen und über einen Versorgungsraum (25, 27) mit Beschichtungsmedium (28a) gefüllt. Das Substrat (23) wird unter der Öffnung (9) des Kapillarspaltes (8) mit der zu beschichtenden Oberfläche (23a) nach oben vorbeigeführt. Mittels einer Zuführvorrichtung (25) wird dem Kapillarspalt (28) über eine Öffnung (11) des Beschichtungsmoduls (2) Beschichtungsmittel (28) nachlieferbar. Die Vorrichtung ermöglicht eine hohe Beschichtungsgeschwindigkeit bei geringerem Lackverbrauch. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/02 (2006.01); B05C 9/02 (2006.01); B05C 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 9/02 (2013.01); B05C 5/0254 (2013.01); B05C 11/1013 (2013.01); Y10S 118/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5650196 A 19970722 - MUEHLFRIEDEL EBERHAR [DE], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010473 A2 20000621; EP 1010473 A3 20030528; EP 1010473 B1 20060712; CA 2292271 A1 20000617; CA 2292271 C 20080318; DE 59913661 D1 20060824; ES 2274611 T3 20070516; MX PA99011776 A 20050419; US 6383571 B1 20020507

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141214

2016-02-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20160205

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141213

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141213

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150831

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20141213

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59913661

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131226

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131228

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131230

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070413

2007-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2274611

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2007-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-10-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060913

2006-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59913661

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-08-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-07-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 05C 5/02 A

2003-05-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 05C 9/02 B

2001-08-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GUARDIAN INDUSTRIES CORP.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI