Global Patent Index - EP 1010476 A2

EP 1010476 A2 2000-06-21 - Roll stand arrangement for the rolling of wire

Title (en)

Roll stand arrangement for the rolling of wire

Title (de)

Walzgerüstanordnung zum Walzen von Draht

Title (fr)

Structure de cage de laminoir pour le laminage de fils

Publication

EP 1010476 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124355 A

Priority

  • DE 19857300 A
  • DE 19919778 A

Abstract (en)

Roll stand arrangement comprises a finishing block located behind the last roll stand of the intermediate group of a wire mill train and a rear block connected to it whose roll stand has an oval pass sequence and a round pass sequence. The pass sequence in the pass roll stands comprises two, three, four or more oval-oval sequence passes and subsequent round passes.

Abstract (de)

Eine Walzgerüstanordnung zum Walzen von Draht mit einem, hinter dem letzten Gerüst der Zwischengruppe einer Drahtwalzstraße angeordneten, aus fest miteinander verbundenen Kaliber-Walzgerüsten gebildeten Fertigblock. Hinter diesem Fertigblock ist ein ebenso ausgebildeter Nachblock angeordnet, dessen Kaliber-Walzgerüste weisen eine Oval-Kaliberfolge und eine, an diese anschließende Rund-Kaliberfolge auf. Die Kaliberfolge in diesen Kaliber-Walzgerüsten des Nachblocks besteht aus zwei, drei, vier oder mehr oval-oval Folgekalibern (OKI, OKII, OKIII) und an diese anschließend aus einem oder zwei Rund-Kalibern (RK). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 1/18; B21B 39/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/16 (2006.01); B21B 1/18 (2006.01); B21B 39/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/18 (2013.01); B21B 39/165 (2013.01); B21B 2203/06 (2013.01); B21B 2273/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010476 A2 20000621; EP 1010476 A3 20030903; JP 2000210704 A 20000802; US 6205835 B1 20010327

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041110

2004-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040629

2004-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991217

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI