Global Patent Index - EP 1010482 A3

EP 1010482 A3 2000-12-06 - Method and device for the fabrication of a braid of metallic wire

Title (en)

Method and device for the fabrication of a braid of metallic wire

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines Geflechtes aus Metalldraht

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de fabrication d'une tresse composée de fils métalliques

Publication

EP 1010482 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 99640001 A

Priority

MC 2414 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1010482A2] The procedure is comprisesed of drawing feed wire (2a,2b) from a supply station toward the braid forming head. The feed wire is subjected to a pressure from a pressure bar (4) to promote plastic deformation of the braid forming wires prior to application to the pipe, sleeve or bushing. An Independent claim is included for machinery to carry out the braid forming process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21F 17/00; B21F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21F 9/00 (2006.01); B21F 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21F 17/00 (2013.01); B21F 9/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1010482 A2 20000621; EP 1010482 A3 20001206; EP 1010482 B1 20040804; DE 69919113 D1 20040909; MC 2489 A1 19991122

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130615

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120621

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050506

2004-11-05 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69919113 P 20040909

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-03-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR THE FABRICATION OF A BRAID OF METALLIC WIRE

2003-09-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNIGASKET S.R.L

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030605

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010129

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI